EP0674652 - DOLASTATIN ANALOG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/40] | DOLOSTATIN ANALOG | ||
[1999/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1995/40] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUPT, Andreas Geibelstrasse 66 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
JANSSEN, Bernd Leuschnerstrasse 18a D-67063 Luwigshafen / DE | 03 /
RITTER, Kurt Albert-Mays-Strasse 12 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | 04 /
KLINGE, Dagmar Brueckenkopfstrasse 15 D-69120 Heidelberg / DE | 05 /
KEILHAUER, Gerhard 185 Roundtop Road Malboro, MA 01752 / US | 06 /
ROMERDAHL, Cynthia 260 Cochituate Road Wayland, MA 01778 / US | 07 /
BARLOZZARI, Teresa 111 Beacon Street 51 Brookline, MA / US | 08 /
QIAN, Xiao-Dong 72 Kingsbury Street Wellesley, MA 02181 / US | [1995/40] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94902676.9 | 04.12.1993 | [1995/40] | WO1993EP03410 | Priority number, date | US19920991309 | 16.12.1992 Original published format: US 991309 | [1995/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9413695 | Date: | 23.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0674652 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0674652 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/027, C07K7/02, A61K38/07, A61K38/08 | [1999/43] | CPC: |
C07K7/02 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K5/0205 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/40] | C07K5/02, A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/40] | Title | German: | DOLASTATIN ANALOG | [1999/43] | English: | DOLASTATIN ANALOG | [1999/43] | French: | ANALOGUE DE DOLASTATINE | [1999/43] |
Former [1995/40] | DOLASTATIN ANLALOGE | ||
Former [1995/40] | DOLOSTATIN ANALOG | ||
Former [1995/40] | ANALOGUE DE DOLOSTATINE | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/40] | 25.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2000 | BE | 13.09.2000 | CH | 13.09.2000 | FR | 13.09.2000 | GR | 13.09.2000 | LI | 13.09.2000 | NL | 13.09.2000 | IE | 04.12.2000 | LU | 04.12.2000 | DK | 13.12.2000 | PT | 13.12.2000 | SE | 13.12.2000 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 13.09.2000 | |
BE | 13.09.2000 | ||
CH | 13.09.2000 | ||
GR | 13.09.2000 | ||
LI | 13.09.2000 | ||
NL | 13.09.2000 | ||
IE | 04.12.2000 | ||
LU | 04.12.2000 | ||
DK | 13.12.2000 | ||
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
FR | 09.02.2001 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 13.09.2000 | |
BE | 13.09.2000 | ||
CH | 13.09.2000 | ||
GR | 13.09.2000 | ||
LI | 13.09.2000 | ||
NL | 13.09.2000 | ||
IE | 04.12.2000 | ||
DK | 13.12.2000 | ||
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
FR | 09.02.2001 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 13.09.2000 | |
BE | 13.09.2000 | ||
CH | 13.09.2000 | ||
LI | 13.09.2000 | ||
NL | 13.09.2000 | ||
IE | 04.12.2000 | ||
DK | 13.12.2000 | ||
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
FR | 09.02.2001 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 13.09.2000 | |
BE | 13.09.2000 | ||
CH | 13.09.2000 | ||
LI | 13.09.2000 | ||
NL | 13.09.2000 | ||
IE | 04.12.2000 | ||
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
FR | 09.02.2001 | ||
Former [2002/17] | AT | 13.09.2000 | |
BE | 13.09.2000 | ||
CH | 13.09.2000 | ||
LI | 13.09.2000 | ||
IE | 04.12.2000 | ||
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
FR | 09.02.2001 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 13.09.2000 | |
BE | 13.09.2000 | ||
CH | 13.09.2000 | ||
LI | 13.09.2000 | ||
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
FR | 09.02.2001 | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT | 13.09.2000 | |
BE | 13.09.2000 | ||
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | BE | 13.09.2000 | |
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
SE | 13.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/22] | BE | 13.09.2000 | |
PT | 13.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/18] | PT | 13.12.2000 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0222283 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,12-14 * examples 4-7 *; | [X]EP0357332 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5,12-14* page 12, compound 7 *; | [PX]WO9303054 (TEIKOKU HORMONE MFG CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,3,6,12-14 * the whole document * | [DX] - R.BAI ET AL, "STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY STUDIES WITH CHIRAL ISOMERS AND WITH SEGMENTS OF THE ANTIMITOTIC MARINE PEPTIDE DOLASTATIN 10", BIOCHEM.PHARMACOL., (1990), vol. 40, no. 8, pages 1859 - 1864 [DX] 1,3,6,7,12-14 * the whole document * | [X] - E.GIRALT ET AL, PEPTIDES 1990, LEIDEN, ESCOM, (1991) [X] 1,3,6,12-14 * T.SHIOIRI ET AL;"A synthetic study on dolastatin 10, an antineoplastic peptide of marine origin"; page 104 - page 106 * | [PX] - R.BAI, "DIFFERENTIAL EFFECTS OF ACTIVE ISOMERS, SEGMENTS, AND ANALOGS OF DOLASTATIN 10 ON LIGAND INTERACTIONS WITH TUBULIN", BIOCHEM.PHARMACOL., (19930406), vol. 45, no. 7, pages 1503 - 1515 [PX] 1,3,6,7,12-14 * the whole document * |