Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0675936

EP0675936 - ENVIRONMENTALLY SAFE DRILLING FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
O'BRIEN-GOINS-SIMPSON & ASSOCIATES, INC.
Suite 112, 6430 Hillcroft Street
Houston, TX 77081 / US
[1995/41]
Inventor(s)01 / WALKER, Thad, O.
1311 St. Andrews Street
Kingwood, TX 77339 / US
[1995/41]
Representative(s)Fisher, Adrian John
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/41]Fisher, Adrian John
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date94903247.809.11.1993
[1995/41]
WO1993US10809
Priority number, dateUS1992099658324.12.1992         Original published format: US 996583
[1995/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9414919
Date:07.07.1994
Language:EN
[1994/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0675936
Date:11.10.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.1994
[1995/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0675936
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.07.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.10.1995
ClassificationInternational:C09K7/02
[1995/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL,   PT [1995/41]
TitleGerman:UMWELTSCHONENDE BOHRFLÜSSIGKEIT[1995/41]
English:ENVIRONMENTALLY SAFE DRILLING FLUID[1995/41]
French:FLUIDE DE FORAGE SANS DANGER POUR L'ENVIRONNEMENT[1995/41]
Entry into regional phase12.07.1995National basic fee paid 
12.07.1995Search fee paid 
12.07.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
12.07.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
12.07.1995Examination requested  [1995/41]
16.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
07.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
27.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.1999Fee for grant paid
19.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
11.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9202594  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-18 * page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 5 * * page 13, line 9 - page 15, line 7; claims 1-17 *;
 [Y]US4528106  (M.A.GROLITZER) [Y] 1-18 * column 2, line 52 - line 68 * * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 16 *
International search[X]USH603H