Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0630405

EP0630405 - Novel V28 seven transmembrane receptor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1994/52]NOVEL SEVEN TRANSMEMBRANE RECEPTORS
[1998/15]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  21.06.2002
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ICOS CORPORATION
22021 20th Avenue, S.E.
Bothell, WA 98021 / US
[N/P]
Former [1994/52]For all designated states
ICOS CORPORATION
22021 20th Avenue, S.E.
Bothell, WA 98201 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GODISKA, Ronald
18076 101st Avenue N.E.
Bothell, WA 98011 / US
02 / GRAY, Patrick, W.
2244 38th Place East
Seattle, WA 98112 / US
03 / SCHWEICKART, Vicki, Louise
1421 Orange Place, North
Seattle, WA 98109 / US
[1995/20]
Former [1994/52]01 / GODISKA, Ronald
18076 101st Avenue N.E.
Bothell, WA 98011 / US
02 / GRAY, Patrick, W.
2244 38th Place East
Seattle, WA 98112 / US
03 / SCHWEICKART, Vicki, Louise
763 Belmont Place e No. 307
Seattle, WA 98102 / US
Representative(s)Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [1994/52]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
D-80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date94903271.817.11.1993
[1994/52]
WO1993US11153
Priority number, dateUS1992097745217.11.1992         Original published format: US 977452
[1994/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9412635
Date:09.06.1994
[1994/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0630405
Date:28.12.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.1994
[1994/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0630405
Date:08.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.11.1994
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C12P21/02, C07K14/705, A61K38/17, C07K16/28, C12N5/10, G01N33/53
[1998/15]
Former International [1994/52]C12N15/12, C12P21/02, C12P21/08, A61K39/00, C12N5/10, C07K13/00, G01N33/53
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1994/52]
TitleGerman:Neue Sieben-Transmembran-Rezeptor V28[1998/15]
English:Novel V28 seven transmembrane receptor[1998/15]
French:Nouveau recepteur V28 du genre sept-transmembrane[1998/15]
Former [1994/52]Sieben neuartige Transmembran Rezeptoren
Former [1994/52]NOVEL SEVEN TRANSMEMBRANE RECEPTORS
Former [1994/52]SEPT NOUVEAUX RECEPTEURS TRANSMEMBRANAIRES
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
MiscellaneousEPB 1998/15: (deleted)
EPB 1998/15: (deleted)
EPB 1998/15: (deleted)
EPB 1997/48: Teilanmeldung 97116471.0 eingereicht am 22/09/97
EPB 1997/48: Divisional application 97116471.0 filed on 22/09/97
EPB 1997/48: Demande divisionnaire 97116471.0 déposée le 22/09/97
Entry into regional phase16.08.1994National basic fee paid 
16.08.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
16.08.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.08.1994Examination requested  [1994/52]
14.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
22.09.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
10.10.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.1998Fee for grant paid
14.01.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP97116471.0  / EP0846762
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.01.1999  27.01.1999  ADMISSIBLE
SmithKline Beecham plc
New Horizons Court,Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Opponent's representative
Valentine, Jill Barbara
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
 02  08.01.1999  26.01.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Duphar International Research B.V.
C.J. van Houtenlaan 36
1381 CP Weesp / NL
Opponent's representative
Oser, Andreas
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1999/10]
Opponent(s)01  07.01.1999   
SmithKline Beecham plc
New Horizons Court,Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Opponent's representative
Valentine, Jill Barbara
SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
 02  08.01.1999   
Duphar International Research B.V.
C.J. van Houtenlaan 36
1381 CP Weesp / NL
Opponent's representative
Oser, Andreas
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Former [1999/09]
Opponent(s)01  07.01.1999   
SmithKline Beecham plc
New Horizons Court,Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Opponent's representative
Valentine, Jill Barbara
SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
01.03.1999Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.09.1999Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.06.2001Date of oral proceedings
22.08.2001Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.08.2001Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
17.06.2002Legal effect of revocation of patent [2002/32]
Appeal following opposition30.10.2001Appeal received No.  T1191/01
27.05.2002Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor inadmissible
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
11.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9218641  (THE TRUSTEES OF BOSTON UNIVERSITY) [A] 1 *page 13, line 10 - page 17, line 24; Figure 2; claims*;
 [A]WO9217497  (GENENTECH, INC.) [A] 1,2 *page 3, line 20 - page 5, line 12; example 2; claims*
 [DA]  - K. SASAKI ET AL.;, "Cloning and expression of a complementary DNA encoding a bovine adrenal angiotensin II type-1 receptor", NATURE, (1991), vol. 351, pages 230 - 233 [DA] 1 *abstract; Figure 1*
 [A]  - J.P.H. BURBACH ET AL.;, "The structure of neuropeptide receptors", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (1992), vol. 227, pages 1 - 18 [A] 1 *abstract; Figures 1 and 2; Table 1; pages 2-4*
 [PA]  - K. NEOTE ET AL.;, "Molecular cloning, functional expression, and signaling characteristics of a C-C chemokine receptor", CELL, (1993), vol. 72, pages 415 - 425 [PA] 2 *summary; Figure 1*
 [PX]  - M. BIRKENBACH ET AL.;, "Epstein-Barr virus-induced genes: first lymphocyte-specific G protein-coupled peptide receptors", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1993), vol. 67 [PX] 1,8-15 *abstract; Figures 1 and 2; discussion*
Examination   - EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY vol. 227 1992 pages 1 - 18 J.P.H. BURBACH ET
    - AL.; 'The structure of neuropeptide receptors'