Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0672084

EP0672084 - A METHOD AND COMPOSITION FOR TREATING METAL SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  02.02.2007
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BULK CHEMICALS, INC.
P.O.Box 186
Mohrsville, PA 19541 / US
[1995/38]
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Lawrence, E.
803 Jerome Place
Reading, PA 19609 / US
02 / WERT, Michael, D.
P.O. Box 2002, RD 2
Laureldale, PA 19605 / US
03 / RIVERA, José, B.
4244 N. Reese Street
Philadelphia, PA 19140 / US
04 / SCHLOSSER, Ted, M.
438 East Broad Street
Tamaqua, PA 18252 / US
[1995/38]
Representative(s)Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire , et al
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [1995/38]Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire , et al
Murgitroyd and Company, 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Application number, filing date94903366.630.11.1993
[1995/38]
WO1993US11627
Priority number, dateUS1992098287430.11.1992         Original published format: US 982874
US1993011289027.08.1993         Original published format: US 112890
[1995/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9412570
Date:09.06.1994
Language:EN
[1994/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0672084
Date:20.09.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.1994
[1995/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0672084
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/15]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0672084
Date:07.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.06.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:C08L29/04, C08L33/02
[1995/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IE [1995/38]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON METALLOBERFLÄCHEN[1995/38]
English:A METHOD AND COMPOSITION FOR TREATING METAL SURFACES[1995/38]
French:PROCEDE ET COMPOSITION DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACES METALLIQUES[1995/38]
Entry into regional phase21.06.1995National basic fee paid 
21.06.1995Search fee paid 
21.06.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.06.1995Examination requested  [1995/38]
15.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.09.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2000Fee for grant paid
10.11.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.01.2002   
HENKEL KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2002/09]
Opponent(s)01  08.01.2002   
Henkel KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
19.02.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.08.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.09.2002Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2003Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
30.09.2003Date of oral proceedings
21.10.2003Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.10.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.09.2006Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.11.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
19.01.2007Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition11.12.2003Appeal received No.  T1238/03
11.12.2003Statement of grounds filed
13.09.2006Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
13.09.2006Date of oral proceedings
02.10.2006Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
02.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.04.2001
IE30.11.2001
[2004/42]
Former [2002/14]AT11.04.2001
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS50144639  (NIPPON STEEL CORP.) [X] 1;
 [X]JPS59225951  (KOBE STEEL LTD) [X] 1;
 [X]DE2749691  (BASF AG) [X] 1,20 * example .; claim - *;
 [A]JPS5175730  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) [A] 1
    [] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19760726), vol. 85, no. 4, Database accession no. 24311 [ ] * abstract *
    [] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 06, Database accession no. 85-033478 [ ] * abstract *
    [] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19761115), vol. 85, no. 20, Database accession no. 144886 [ ] * abstract *
International search[XY]US3912548  (FAIGEN HARRY L);
 [Y]US4148670  (KELLY TIMM L);
 [Y]US4191596  (DOLLMAN DAVID Y [US], et al)