Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0681437

EP0681437 - COMPOSITE FABRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2001
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ISOLYSER COMPANY, INC.
4320 International Boulevard
Norcross, GA 30093 / US
For all designated states
HONEYCUTT, Travis W.
3544 Mill Road
Gainesville, GA 30504 / US
[1995/46]
Inventor(s)01 / HONEYCUTT, Travis, W.
3544 Mill Road
Gainesville, GA 30504 / US
[1995/46]
Representative(s)Pendlebury, Anthony , et al
PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
[1995/46]
Application number, filing date94903383.101.12.1993
[1995/46]
WO1993US11657
Priority number, dateUS1993000982426.01.1993         Original published format: US 9824
[1995/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9416585
Date:04.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0681437
Date:15.11.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.1994
[1995/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0681437
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.08.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:A41D31/02, A47G9/02, B32B27/12
[1996/42]
Former International [1995/46]A41D1/00, A47G9/00, B08B3/08, B32B33/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/46]
TitleGerman:VERBUNDVLIESSTOFF[1995/46]
English:COMPOSITE FABRIC[1995/46]
French:TISSU COMPOSITE[1995/46]
Entry into regional phase14.06.1995National basic fee paid 
14.06.1995Search fee paid 
14.06.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
14.06.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.08.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
14.06.1995Examination requested  [1995/46]
20.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.06.2000Fee for grant paid
23.06.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
08.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
06.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.11.2000
GR02.11.2000
IT02.11.2000
IE01.12.2000
LU01.12.2000
MC02.01.2001
DK02.02.2001
PT02.02.2001
[2008/05]
Former [2006/39]AT02.11.2000
GR02.11.2000
IE01.12.2000
LU01.12.2000
MC02.01.2001
DK02.02.2001
PT02.02.2001
Former [2004/39]AT02.11.2000
GR02.11.2000
IE01.12.2000
LU01.12.2000
DK02.02.2001
PT02.02.2001
Former [2004/07]AT02.11.2000
GR02.11.2000
IE01.12.2000
DK02.02.2001
PT02.02.2001
Former [2003/45]AT02.11.2000
IE01.12.2000
DK02.02.2001
PT02.02.2001
Former [2002/17]AT02.11.2000
IE01.12.2000
PT02.02.2001
Former [2002/11]AT02.11.2000
PT02.02.2001
Former [2001/37]AT02.11.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0320895  (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-8,12 * column W *;
 [PX]JPH05140350  ;
 [DA]GB2254626  (ISOLYSER CO [US]) [DA] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930917), vol. 017, no. 516, Database accession no. (C - 1112), & JP05140350 A 19930608 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD) [PX] 1-3,5-9,11,12 * abstract *
International search[A]US3859125  (MILLER ALBERT R, et al)