Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0746208

EP0746208 - NATURAL CARBOHYDRATE GUM HYDROLYZATE COATED CHEWING GUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.08.2001 [2001/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WM. WRIGLEY JR. COMPANY
410 North Michigan Avenue
Chicago, Illinois 60611 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/50]For all designated states
WM. WRIGLEY JR. COMPANY
410 North Michigan Avenue
Chicago Illinois 60611 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RICHEY, Lindell C.
1408 Eddy Lane
Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US
02 / HOOK, Jeffrey S.
3209 South Clinton
Berwyn, IL 60402 / US
03 / REED, Michael A.
5341 Lincoln
Merrilliville, IN 46410 / US
04 / YATKA, Robert J.
15127 South St. Andrews Court
Orland Park, IL 60462 / US
[1996/50]
Representative(s)Baverstock, Michael George Douglas , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/50]Baverstock, Michael George Douglas , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London, EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date94903442.503.12.1993
[1996/50]
WO1993US11764
Priority number, dateWO1992US1119803.12.1993         Original published format: PCT/US92/11198
[1996/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9414331
Date:07.07.1994
Language:EN
[1994/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0746208
Date:11.12.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.1994
[1996/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0746208
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.07.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:A23G3/30
[1996/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/50]
TitleGerman:MIT NATÜRLICHEM KOHLENHYDRATGUMMI-HYDROLYSAT BESCHICHTETER KAUGUMMI[1996/50]
English:NATURAL CARBOHYDRATE GUM HYDROLYZATE COATED CHEWING GUM[1996/50]
French:CHEWING-GUM ENROBE D'UN HYDROLYSAT DE GOMME DE GLUCIDES NATURELS[1996/50]
Entry into regional phase22.06.1995National basic fee paid 
22.06.1995Search fee paid 
22.06.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.06.1995Examination requested  [1996/50]
10.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.02.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.2000Fee for grant paid
04.05.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
11.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[DX]WO9315116  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [GB]) [DX] 1,2,6,8-10,19 * the whole document *
International search[A]US4332894  (WHISTLER ROY L);
 [A]US4828845  (ZAMUDIO-TENA JOSE F [US], et al);
 [A]US4127677  (FRONCZKOWSKI PAUL R, et al);
 [A]EP0449594  (RHONE POULENC IND [US]);
 [A]EP0457098  (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US])