blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0625948


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.06.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2007  [2007/29]
26.12.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.02.2004  [2004/07]
19.09.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.11.2003  [2003/45]
04.01.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2003  [2003/08]
30.08.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.10.2002  [2002/42]
09.05.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2002  [2002/26]
02.03.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.04.2001 [2001/16]
23.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.04.2001 [2001/15]
26.01.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2001 [2001/11]
10.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
28.01.2000 Change - English title published on  15.03.2000 [2000/11]
22.12.1999 Renewal fee
14.12.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant
03.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.05.1999 Communication of intention to grant
14.04.1999 Examination report or reply
16.12.1998 Change - request for further processing
15.12.1998 Renewal fee
09.12.1998 Examination report or reply
09.12.1998 Change - request for further processing
08.12.1998 Change - request for further processing
04.12.1998 Change - request for further processing
24.09.1998 Application deemed to be withdrawn
05.06.1998 Examination report or reply
06.02.1998 First examination report
03.02.1998 Examination report or reply
03.07.1997 Renewal fee
12.04.1997 Renewal fee
13.12.1996 Supplementary search report published on  29.01.1997 [1997/05]
06.12.1996 Change - classification published on  22.01.1997 [1997/04]
09.01.1996 Renewal fee
14.10.1994 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.11.1994 [1994/48]
14.10.1994 Request for examination filed published on  30.11.1994 [1994/48]