blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0625948
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0625948Global Dossier 26.04.2000B1
EP0625948 29.01.1997A4
EP0625948 30.11.1994A1
Priority number Date
US99278092 18.12.1992
US9312490 20.12.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT192103T 15.05.2000T
Priority number Date
US99278092 18.12.1992
US9312490 20.12.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU5958094 19.07.1994A
Priority number Date
US99278092 18.12.1992
US9312490 20.12.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69328473D 31.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
US99278092 18.12.1992
US9312490 20.12.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69328473T 07.09.2000T2
Priority number Date
US99278092 18.12.1992
US9312490 20.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9414665Global Dossier 07.07.1994A1
Priority number Date
US99278092 18.12.1992