blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0625948

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 26.04.2000
 BE 
 CH 
 DE 
 DKLapse: 26.07.2000
 ESLapse: 26.04.2000
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 26.04.2000
 IE 
 IT 
 LI 
 LULapse: 20.12.2000
 MCLapse: 31.12.2000
 NLLapse: 26.04.2000
 PTLapse: 26.07.2000
 SE 
Examination procedure06.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase16.08.1994National basic fee paid 
16.08.1994Search fee paid 
16.08.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
16.08.1994Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
01.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
04.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
06.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.199604   M06   Fee paid on   01.04.1997
European patent granted26.04.2000
Opposition procedure27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit published on 11.04.2001 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:30.11.1994 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:30.11.1994 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19940818
 
Event date:29.01.1997 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A4
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:29.01.1997 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19961209
 
Event date:25.03.1998 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19980206
 
Event date:15.03.2000 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:A RESEALABLE CAP
 
Event date:26.04.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20000426
 
Event date:26.04.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY
Effective DATE:20000426
 
Event date:26.04.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20000426
 
Event date:26.04.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20000426
 
Event date:26.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:26.04.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:192103
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000515
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:28.04.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:28.04.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:KIRKER & CIE SA
 
Event date:31.05.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69328473
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000531
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:31.05.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:08.06.2000 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
Owner Name:FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.
 
Event date:09.06.2000 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:26.07.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20000726
 
Event date:26.07.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20000726
 
Event date:02.10.2000 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT
 
Event date:20.12.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20001220
 
Event date:31.12.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY
Effective DATE:20001231
 
Event date:11.04.2001 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:02.08.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CL
Code Expl.: CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES
 
Event date:20.09.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR GC
Code Expl.: LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED
 
Event date:22.08.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR GC
Code Expl.: LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED
 
Event date:29.12.2003 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20031229
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.12.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
 
Event date:29.01.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20040129
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:15.04.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20040415
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:16.04.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20040416
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:18.05.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20040518
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:08.12.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20041208
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:15.12.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20041215
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:20.12.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20041220
 
Event date:21.12.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20041221
 
Event date:31.12.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20041231
 
Event date:31.12.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20041231
 
Event date:31.12.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20041231
 
Event date:30.06.2005 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:*CAPITOL VIAL INC.
Effective DATE:20041231
 
Event date:01.07.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20050701
 
Event date:02.08.2005 
Event description:SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:15.08.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:21.09.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:20.12.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20051220
 
Event date:20.12.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20051220
 
Event date:23.08.2006 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20051220
 
Event date:31.08.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20060831
 
Event date:17.11.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20060831
 
Event date:31.12.2007 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:*CAPITOL VIAL INC.
Effective DATE:20041231