Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0625948

EP0625948 - A RESEALABLE CAP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1994/48]A RESEASABLE CAP
[2000/11]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 18.07.2007  [2007/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CAPITOL VIAL, INC.
42 Union Street, P.O. Box 446
Fultonville, NY 12072 / US
[1994/48]
Inventor(s)01 / ABRAMS, Robert, S.
21 Marion Avenue
Albany, NY 12203 / US
02 / SUPRANOWICZ, Ronald, P.
38 Hawthorne Street
Lenox, MA 01240 / US
[1994/48]
Representative(s)Pendlebury, Anthony , et al
PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
[1994/48]
Application number, filing date94905487.820.12.1993
[1994/48]
WO1993US12490
Priority number, dateUS1992099278018.12.1992         Original published format: US 992780
[1994/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9414665
Date:07.07.1994
Language:EN
[1994/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0625948
Date:30.11.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.1994
[1994/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0625948
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.07.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1996
ClassificationInternational:B65D5/74, B65D41/18, B65D47/08
[1997/04]
Former International [1994/48]B65D5/74
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1994/48]
TitleGerman:HERMETISCH WIEDERVERSCHLIESSBARE KAPPE[1994/48]
English:A RESEALABLE CAP[2000/11]
French:BOUCHON REFERMABLE HERMETIQUEMENT[1994/48]
Former [1994/48]A RESEASABLE CAP
Entry into regional phase16.08.1994National basic fee paid 
16.08.1994Search fee paid 
16.08.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
16.08.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.1994Examination requested  [1994/48]
06.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.09.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.1999Fee for grant paid
06.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Request for further processing for:02.12.1998Request for further processing filed
27.11.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.12.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
01.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
04.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
06.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.199604   M06   Fee paid on   01.04.1997
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.04.2000
ES26.04.2000
GR26.04.2000
NL26.04.2000
DK26.07.2000
PT26.07.2000
LU20.12.2000
MC31.12.2000
[2007/29]
Former [2004/07]AT26.04.2000
ES26.04.2000
GR26.04.2000
NL26.04.2000
DK26.07.2000
PT26.07.2000
MC31.12.2000
Former [2003/45]AT26.04.2000
ES26.04.2000
NL26.04.2000
DK26.07.2000
PT26.07.2000
MC31.12.2000
Former [2003/08]AT26.04.2000
ES26.04.2000
NL26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
MC31.12.2000
Former [2002/42]AT26.04.2000
ES26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
MC31.12.2000
Former [2002/26]AT26.04.2000
ES26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
Former [2001/16]AT26.04.2000
PT26.07.2000
Former [2001/11]AT26.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]DE882655  (GEIGER ALBERT, et al) [X] 1 * page 2, lines 51-59; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US3470930  (JURCZENIA EDWARD T) [X] 1,4 * column 1, lines 61-68; figure 2 *;
 [X]CH675410  (ALFATECHNIC AG) [X] 19,22 * column 2, lines 29-31; figures 1-5 *
International search[YP]US5199635  (ABRAMS ROBERT S [US], et al);
 [Y]US5108029  (ABRAMS ROBERT S [US], et al);
 [A]US4635823  (STULL GENE [US]);
 [A]US4420089  (WALKER CHARLES B [US], et al)