Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0676069

EP0676069 - FILE TRANSLATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.01.1999
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
APPLE COMPUTER, INC.
20525 Mariani Avenue Cupertino
California 95014 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/41]For all designated states
APPLE COMPUTER, INC.
20525 Mariani Avenue
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ASHE, Dylan, B.
870 East El Camino Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
02 / KLEDZIK, Nick, G.
21103 Patriot Way
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[1995/41]
Representative(s)Poulin, Gérard , et al
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Poulin, Gérard , et al
Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [1995/41]Poulin, Gérard , et al
Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date94905524.827.12.1993
[1995/41]
WO1993US12585
Priority number, dateUS1992099768828.12.1992         Original published format: US 997688
[1995/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9415307
Date:07.07.1994
Language:EN
[1994/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0676069
Date:11.10.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.1994
[1995/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0676069
Date:11.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.07.1994
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/22, G06F17/30
[1998/11]
Former International [1995/41]G06F15/20, G06F15/403
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/41]
TitleGerman:DATEIENUMSETZUNGSSYSTEM[1995/41]
English:FILE TRANSLATION SYSTEM[1995/41]
French:SYSTEME DE TRADUCTION DE FICHIERS[1995/41]
Entry into regional phase13.07.1995National basic fee paid 
13.07.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
13.07.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.07.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.07.1995Examination requested  [1995/41]
05.03.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
30.10.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.08.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.1997Fee for grant paid
07.11.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.12.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1999/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
24.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.03.1998
BE11.03.1998
CH11.03.1998
ES11.03.1998
FR11.03.1998
GR11.03.1998
IT11.03.1998
LI11.03.1998
NL11.03.1998
DK11.06.1998
SE11.06.1998
PT15.06.1998
[2006/14]
Former [2003/45]AT11.03.1998
BE11.03.1998
CH11.03.1998
ES11.03.1998
GR11.03.1998
IT11.03.1998
LI11.03.1998
NL11.03.1998
DK11.06.1998
SE11.06.1998
PT15.06.1998
FR07.08.1998
Former [2003/08]AT11.03.1998
BE11.03.1998
CH11.03.1998
ES11.03.1998
GR11.03.1998
IT11.03.1998
LI11.03.1998
NL11.03.1998
SE11.06.1998
PT15.06.1998
FR07.08.1998
Former [2002/26]AT11.03.1998
BE11.03.1998
CH11.03.1998
ES11.03.1998
GR11.03.1998
IT11.03.1998
LI11.03.1998
SE11.06.1998
PT15.06.1998
FR07.08.1998
Former [2001/23]AT11.03.1998
BE11.03.1998
CH11.03.1998
GR11.03.1998
IT11.03.1998
LI11.03.1998
SE11.06.1998
PT15.06.1998
FR07.08.1998
Former [1999/42]AT11.03.1998
BE11.03.1998
CH11.03.1998
IT11.03.1998
LI11.03.1998
SE11.06.1998
PT15.06.1998
FR07.08.1998
Former [1998/52]AT11.03.1998
BE11.03.1998
CH11.03.1998
LI11.03.1998
SE11.06.1998
PT15.06.1998
FR07.08.1998
Former [1998/50]AT11.03.1998
BE11.03.1998
CH11.03.1998
LI11.03.1998
SE11.06.1998
PT15.06.1998
Former [1998/49]AT11.03.1998
BE11.03.1998
SE11.06.1998
PT15.06.1998
Former [1998/47]AT11.03.1998
SE11.06.1998
PT15.06.1998
Former [1998/43]AT11.03.1998
SE11.06.1998
Former [1998/40]AT11.03.1998
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0408132  (OCE NEDERLAND BV [NL]) [X] 1-32 * column 4, line 14 - column 5, line 23 *;
 [A]US5065347  (PAJAK HENRY G [US], et al) [A] 17-20,24-28,32 * abstract * * column 5, line 59 - line 68 *;
 [A]EP0192927  (IBM [US]) [A] 1,9,25 * abstract *;
 [D]US4686522  (HERNANDEZ IRENE H [US], et al)
 [A]  - "Automatic Selection of a Transformation Graph based on User Criteria", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., ARMONK US, (199111), vol. 34, no. 6, pages 157 - 158, XP000228391 [A] 1,3,5,30 * the whole document *
 [A]  - N. AJITOMI, "Design of Generalized Document Viewer Using Object Chain Representation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 15TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL COMPUTER SOFTWARE & APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE - COMPSAC, TOKYO, JP, (199109), pages 204 - 211, XP000260538 [A] 1-32 * page 205, column L, paragraph 5 * * page 209, column L, paragraph 4 - column R, paragraph 1 *