Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0684929

EP0684929 - DEVICE FOR STACKING SHEETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2001
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.04.2001 [2001/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mars Incorporated
6885 Elm Street McLean
Virginia 22101-3883 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
MARS, INCORPORATED
6885 Elm Street
McLean, Virginia 22101-3883 / US
Former [1995/49]For all designated states
MARS INCORPORATED
6885 Elm Street
McLean Virginia 22101-3883 / US
Inventor(s)01 / POLIDORO, Roberto
64, rue Frank-Thomas
CH-1208 Genève / CH
[1995/49]
Representative(s)Burke, Steven David , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/49]Burke, Steven David , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date94905822.615.02.1994
[1995/49]
WO1994IB00013
Priority number, dateCH1993000047116.02.1993         Original published format: CH 47193
[1995/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9419269
Date:01.09.1994
Language:EN
[1994/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0684929
Date:06.12.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.1994
[1995/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0684929
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.09.1994
ClassificationInternational:B65H29/46
[1995/49]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1995/49]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM STAPELN VON BOGEN[1995/49]
English:DEVICE FOR STACKING SHEETS[1995/49]
French:DISPOSITIF D'EMPILEMENT DE FEUILLES[1995/49]
Entry into regional phase06.09.1995National basic fee paid 
06.09.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
06.09.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.09.1995Examination requested  [1995/49]
12.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.1997Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.03.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.06.1999Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
28.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.1999Fee for grant paid
02.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03005809.3  / EP1319619
EP99102315.1  / EP0919500
Opposition(s)06.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17]
Request for further processing for:08.07.1999Request for further processing filed
08.07.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.07.1999Decision despatched
27.03.1997Request for further processing filed
27.03.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
15.04.1997Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
10.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.199603   M06   Fee paid on   20.05.1996
Cited inInternational search[A]US4765607  (ZOUZOULAS JOHN [US]) [A] 1,11,18-20 * column 9, line 5 - column 11, line 60; figures 7-9 *;
 [DA]EP0197656  (MARS INC [US])