Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0682547

EP0682547 - PLAYING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/47]PLAYING STRUCTURE, STORAGE SYSTEM MODULES THEREFOR
[2000/46]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2001
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.11.2001 [2001/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
550058 ALBERTA LIMITED
Suite 3300, 421-7 Avenue, S.W Calgary
Alberta T2P 4K9 / CA
[N/P]
Former [1995/47]For all designated states
550058 ALBERTA LIMITED
Suite 3300, 421-7 Avenue, S.W
Calgary, Alberta T2P 4K9 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / DE CHAZAL, Robert
11518-77 Avenue
Edmonton, Alberta T6G 0M1 / CA
[1995/47]
Representative(s)Austin, Hedley William , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Churchill House
Churchill Way
Cardiff
CF10 2HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/47]Austin, Hedley William , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road
Swansea West Glamorgan SA1 5ED / GB
Application number, filing date94906108.904.02.1994
[1995/47]
WO1994CA00062
Priority number, dateUS1993001332404.02.1993         Original published format: US 13324
US1993006131514.05.1993         Original published format: US 61315
[1995/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9417881
Date:18.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0682547
Date:22.11.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.1994
[1995/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0682547
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.08.1994
ClassificationInternational:A63F9/10, A63F3/04, A63F3/02
[1995/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/47]
TitleGerman:SPIELSTRUKTUR[2000/46]
English:PLAYING STRUCTURE[2000/46]
French:STRUCTURE DE JEU[2000/46]
Former [1995/47]SPIELSTRUKTUR, LAGERUNGSSYSTEM UND MODUL DAFÜR
Former [1995/47]PLAYING STRUCTURE, STORAGE SYSTEM MODULES THEREFOR
Former [1995/47]STRUCTURE DE JEU, SYSTEME DE RANGEMENT ET MODULES ASSOCIES
Entry into regional phase04.09.1995National basic fee paid 
04.09.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.09.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.09.1995Examination requested  [1995/47]
17.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
23.07.1998Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
02.10.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
25.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
19.01.2000Fee for grant paid
19.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/45]
Request for further processing for:21.01.2000Request for further processing filed
14.01.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.02.2000Decision despatched
02.10.1998Request for further processing filed
14.09.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
27.10.1998Decision despatched
04.07.1997Request for further processing filed
01.07.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
23.07.1997Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
19.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
30.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.199704   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.1997
29.02.200007   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]WO8505282  (QUARTARARO JACK M, et al) [A] 1,8 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4696476  (EPLETT GENE W [US]) [A] 1,8 * figures 5,6 *;
 [A]FR1301456  (EDITIONS LACROIX & LEBEAU) [A] 1,8