Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0662806

EP0662806 - A FLEXIBLE STENT HAVING A PATTERN FORMED FROM A SHEET OF MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2002
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.04.2002  [2002/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cook Incorporated
925 South Curry Pike
Bloomington, IN 47402-0489 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
Cook Incorporated
925 South Curry Pike
Bloomington IN 47402-0489 / US
Former [1995/29]For all designated states
Cook Incorporated
925 South Curry Pike P.O. Box 489
Bloomington Indiana 47402 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BOATMAN, Scott, E.
920E. University Street
Bloomington, IN 47401 / US
02 / BRUMMETT, Kimberly D., Route I
Box 414 B
Springville, IN 47462 / US
[1995/29]
Representative(s)Johnston, Kenneth Graham
c/o Cook (UK) Ltd. Patent Department Monroe House Letchworth
Hertfordshire SG6 1LN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Johnston, Kenneth Graham
c(o Cook (UK) Ltd. Patent Department Monroe House
Letchworth Hertfordshire SG6 1LN / GB
Former [1995/29]Johnston, Kenneth Graham
5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date94906451.320.12.1993
[1995/29]
WO1993US12472
Priority number, dateUS1993009739223.07.1993         Original published format: US 97392
[1995/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9503010
Date:02.02.1995
Language:EN
[1995/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0662806
Date:19.07.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.1995
[1995/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0662806
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.02.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06
[1995/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/29]
TitleGerman:FLEXIBLER STENT MIT EINER AUS EINEM MATERIALBOGEN GEFORMTEN KONFIGURATION[1995/29]
English:A FLEXIBLE STENT HAVING A PATTERN FORMED FROM A SHEET OF MATERIAL[1995/29]
French:EXTENSEUR VASCULAIRE SOUPLE PRESENTANT UNE CONFIGURATION FORMEE A PARTIR D'UNE FEUILLE DE MATERIAU[1995/29]
Entry into regional phase10.03.1995National basic fee paid 
10.03.1995Search fee paid 
10.03.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
10.03.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.03.1995Examination requested  [1995/29]
03.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
14.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.2000Fee for grant paid
20.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/14]
Request for further processing for:28.11.1998Request for further processing filed
27.11.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.12.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
11.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
07.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0481365  (ANGIOMED AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-10 * column 8, line 18 - column 9, line 38; figures 6-10 *;
 [A]US4969458  (WIKTOR DOMINIK M [US]) [A] 1-4,7,9 * column 4, line 24 - line 32; figure - *;
 [X]EP0540290  (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [X] 1,6,10 * abstract *;
 [XA]WO9306792  (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,3,8-10 * page 7, line 26 - line 30; figure 1 * [A] 7;
 [X]FR2660562  (PEROUSE SA LABORATOIRES [FR]) [X] 1,3,8-10 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 21; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]FR2617721  (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]) [X] 1,3,8-10 * page 10, line 3 - line 9; figures 14A,14B *;
 [AX]EP0274846  (ADVANCED SURGICAL INTERVENTION [US]) [A] 6,7,7 * column 13, line 35 - line 47; figures 19-21 * * column 15, line 37 - line 50 * [X] 9,10;
 [XA]WO8300997  (WALLSTEN HANS IVAR [CH]) [X] 9,10 * page 24, line 11 - line 22 * * page 17, line 5 - line 27; figure 22 * [A] 1,8;
 [X]EP0364787  (EXPANDABLE GRAFTS PARTNERSHIP [US]) [X] 1,7,10 * column 7, line 28 - line 48 * * column 12, line 23 - line 32; figures 1A,1B,7 *;
 [DA]US4907336  (GIANTURCO CESARE [US], et al) [DA] 1-5,9 * abstract *