Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0662201

EP0662201 - CARBON TO CARBON FRICTION MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.12.2003  [2003/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TILTON ENGINEERING, INC.
25 Easy Street
Buellton, CA 93427 / US
[1995/28]
Inventor(s)01 / HENDRIX, Roger, Hubert
3354 Drake Drive
Santa Maria, CA 93455 / US
02 / BERNAL, Christopher, Patrick
365 St. Joseph Street
Los Alamos, CA 93440 / US
03 / TILTON, McLane
2645 Quail Valley Road
Solvang, CA 93463 / US
[1995/28]
Representative(s)Rackham, Stephen Neil
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/28]Rackham, Stephen Neil
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date94908054.310.08.1993
[1995/28]
WO1993US07513
Priority number, dateUS1992092929913.08.1992         Original published format: US 929299
[1995/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9404838
Date:03.03.1994
Language:EN
[1994/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0662201
Date:12.07.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.1994
[1995/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0662201
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.03.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.1995
ClassificationInternational:F16D13/71, F16D13/56, F16D13/68
[1995/28]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/28]
TitleGerman:KOHLENSTOFF-KOHLENSTOFF REIBMECHANISMUS[1995/28]
English:CARBON TO CARBON FRICTION MECHANISM[1995/28]
French:MECANISME A FRICTION CARBONE CONTRE CARBONE[1995/28]
Entry into regional phase03.03.1995National basic fee paid 
03.03.1995Search fee paid 
03.03.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.03.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.03.1995Examination requested  [1995/28]
06.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.11.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
03.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.05.2002Fee for grant paid
31.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
17.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
21.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
25.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
09.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200210   M06   Fee paid on   09.10.2002
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[XY]US2002943  (HARTLEY ALFRED J);
 [X]US1717534  (WEMP ERNEST E);
 [XY]US1756428  (JONES FRANK H);
 [XY]US4744448  (MAYCOCK IAN C [GB], et al);
 [X]US3010555  (GARMAGER CURT H);
 [XY]US1510123  (WEMP ERNEST E);
 [X]US4846326  (TILTON MCLANE [US], et al);
 [X]US4095683  (BAN HIROSHI)