Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0655448

EP0655448 - BENZOPYRAN AND BENZOXAZINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku
Tokyo 115 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/22]For all designated states
CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku
Tokyo 115 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KOGA, Hiroshi
Chugai Seiyaku K. K., 135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka Shizuoka 412 / JP
02 / SATO, Haruhiko
Chugai Seiyaku K. K., 135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka Shizuoka 412 / JP
03 / ISHIZAWA, Takenori
Chugai Seiyaku K. K., 135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka 412zuoka 412 / JP
04 / NABATA, Hiroyuki
Chugai Seiyaku K. K., 135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka Shizuoka 412 / JP
[1999/12]
Former [1995/22]01 / KOGA, Hiroshi
Chugai Seiyaku K. K., 135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka 412zuoka 412 / JP
02 / SATO, Haruhiko
Chugai Seiyaku K. K., 135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka 412zuoka 412 / JP
03 / ISHIZAWA, Takenori
Chugai Seiyaku K. K., 135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka 412zuoka 412 / JP
04 / NABATA, Hiroyuki
Chugai Seiyaku K. K., 135, Komakado 1-chome
Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka 412 uoka 412 / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/22]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Postfach 86 07 67
D-81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date94908117.817.08.1993
[1995/22]
WO1993JP01150
Priority number, dateJP1992021797517.08.1992         Original published format: JP 21797592
JP1993008846215.04.1993         Original published format: JP 8846293
[1995/22]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9404521
Date:03.03.1994
Language:EN
[1994/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0655448
Date:31.05.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.1994
[1995/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0655448
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.03.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.1995
ClassificationInternational:C07D311/68, C07D311/22, C07D265/20, C07D265/22, C07D405/04, C07D405/12, C07D413/04, C07D413/12, C07D417/04, A61K31/35, A61K31/44
[1995/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/22]
TitleGerman:BENZOPYRAN UND BENZOXAZIN-DERIVATE[1995/22]
English:BENZOPYRAN AND BENZOXAZINE DERIVATIVES[1995/22]
French:DERIVES DE BENZOPYRANNE ET DE BENZOXAZINE[1995/22]
Entry into regional phase15.02.1995Translation filed 
08.03.1995National basic fee paid 
08.03.1995Search fee paid 
08.03.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
08.03.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
08.03.1995Examination requested  [1995/22]
22.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
05.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
20.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
14.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.1999Fee for grant paid
15.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
GR12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
DK12.07.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
IE17.08.2000
LU17.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2004/07]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
GR12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
DK12.07.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
IE17.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
Former [2003/45]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
DK12.07.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
IE17.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
Former [2003/08]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
IE17.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
Former [2002/42]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
IE17.08.2000
MC31.08.2000
Former [2002/02]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
IE17.08.2000
Former [2001/50]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
IE17.08.2000
Former [2001/26]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
Former [2001/16]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
Former [2001/11]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]DE4018552  (SANDOZ AG [DE])
 [P]  - Tetrahedron Letters, 34 (11), p. 1815-1818, 1993.,