Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0695465

EP0695465 - RECHARGEABLE ZINC-MANGANESE DIOXIDE CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/06]MANGANESE DIOXIDE POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR RECHARGEABLE CELLS, AND CELLS CONTAINING THE SAME
[2000/01]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 18.07.2007  [2007/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BATTERY TECHNOLOGIES INC.
30 Pollard Street Richmond Hill
Ontario L4B 1C3 / CA
[N/P]
Former [1996/06]For all designated states
BATTERY TECHNOLOGIES INC.
30 Pollard Street
Richmond Hill, Ontario L4B 1C3 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / TOMANTSCHGER, Klaus
6197 Montevideo Road
Mississauga, Ontario L5N 2E8 / CA
02 / MICHALOWSKI, Christopher
3580 Chartrand Crescent
Missisauga, Ontario L5L 4E4 / CA
[1996/06]
Representative(s)Rackham, Anthony Charles
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/06]Rackham, Anthony Charles
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand
London WC2R 0AE / GB
Application number, filing date94908227.528.02.1994
[1996/06]
WO1994CA00112
Priority number, dateUS1993004940520.04.1993         Original published format: US 49405
[1996/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9424718
Date:27.10.1994
[1994/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0695465
Date:07.02.1996
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.1994
[1996/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0695465
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.10.1994
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/24, H01M4/24, H01M4/50, H01M4/62
[1996/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/06]
TitleGerman:WIEDERAUFLADBARE ZINK-MANGANDIOXID ZELLEN[2000/01]
English:RECHARGEABLE ZINC-MANGANESE DIOXIDE CELLS[2000/01]
French:PILES RECHARGEABLES ZINC-DIOXYDE DE MANGANESE[2000/01]
Former [1996/06]POSITIVE MANGANDIOXIDELEKTRODE FUER AUFLADBARZELLEN UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE ZELLEN
Former [1996/06]MANGANESE DIOXIDE POSITIVE ELECTRODE FOR RECHARGEABLE CELLS, AND CELLS CONTAINING THE SAME
Former [1996/06]ELECTRODE POSITIVE AU DIOXYDE DE MANGANESE POUR PILES RECHARGEABLES ET PILES CONTENANT CES ELECTRODES
Entry into regional phase16.10.1995National basic fee paid 
16.10.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.10.1995Examination requested  [1996/06]
30.04.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
25.10.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
28.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.08.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.1999Fee for grant paid
08.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
IE28.02.2000
LU28.02.2000
MC05.03.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
[2007/29]
Former [2004/07]BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
IE28.02.2000
MC05.03.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
Former [2003/45]BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
IE28.02.2000
MC05.03.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
Former [2003/08]BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
IE28.02.2000
MC05.03.2000
PT05.04.2000
Former [2002/42]BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
IE28.02.2000
MC05.03.2000
PT05.04.2000
Former [2002/23]BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
IE28.02.2000
PT05.04.2000
Former [2001/17]BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
IE28.02.2000
PT05.04.2000
Former [2001/09]BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
Former [2001/08]BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
Former [2000/52]CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
Former [2000/50]CH10.04.2000
LI10.04.2000
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4091178  (KORDESCH KARL VICTOR) [Y] 1-17 * column W *;
 [Y]WO9112635  (BATTERY TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]) [Y] 1-17 * claims 1-46 *;
 [Y]JPS634555  ;
 [PX]WO9318557  (BATTERY TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]) [PX] 1-17 * claims 1-17 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880611), vol. 12, no. 204, Database accession no. (E - 620), [Y] 8 * abstract *
Examination   - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 204 (E-620) 11 June 1988 & JP,A,63 004
    - 555 (TOSHIBA BATTERY CO. LTD.) 9 January 1988