Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0686144

EP0686144 - NEW COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University of Maryland, Baltimore
520 Lombard Street Baltimore
Maryland 21201 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/24]For all designated states
University of Maryland, Baltimore
520 Lombard Street
Baltimore, Maryland 21201 / US
Former [1995/50]For all designated states
Astra Aktiebolag
S-151 85 Södertälje / SE
For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND
511 West Lombard Street
Baltimore, Maryland 21202-1691 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BJÖRK, Susanna, Karin, Maria
Bollvägen 69
S-151 59 Södertälje / SE
02 / GOTTHAMMAR, Kristina, Birgitta
Björkholmsvägen 188
S-132 31 Saltsjö-Boo / SE
03 / LINDERBERG, Mats, Torbjörn
Kämpevägen 29
S-151 54 Södertälje / SE
04 / LUTHMAN, Per, Johan
Malargatan 1
S-646 00 Gnesta / SE
05 / PERSSON, Kerstin, Margareta, Irma
Lillhagavägen 6
S-155 31 Nykvarn / SE
06 / SCHWARCZ, Robert
6936 Ten Timbers Lane
Baltimore, MD 21209 / US
[2000/10]
Former [1995/50]01 / BJÖRK, Susanna, Karin, Maria
Bollvägen 69
S-151 59 Södertälje / SE
02 / GOTTHAMMAR, Kristina, Birgitta
Björkholmsvägen 188
S-132 31 Saltsjö-Boo / SE
03 / LINDERBERG, Mats, Torbjörn
Kämpevägen 29
S-151 54 Södertälje / SE
04 / LUTHMAN, Per, Johan
M largatan 1
S-646 00 Gnesta / SE
05 / PERSSON, Kerstin, Margareta, Irma
Lillhagavägen 6
S-155 31 Nykvarn / SE
06 / SCHWARCZ, Robert
6936 Ten Timbers Lane
Baltimore, MD 21209 / US
Representative(s)Lucas, Brian Ronald , et al
Lucas & Co.
135 Westhall Road
Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/24]Lucas, Brian Ronald , et al
Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road
Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB
Application number, filing date94908556.724.02.1994
[1995/50]
WO1994SE00152
Priority number, dateSE1993000065726.02.1993         Original published format: SE 9300657
[1995/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9419315
Date:01.09.1994
Language:EN
[1994/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0686144
Date:13.12.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.1994
[1995/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0686144
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE01.09.1994
ClassificationInternational:C07C229/64, C07C323/63, C07C255/59, A61K31/195, C07C205/59
[1995/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/50]
TitleGerman:NEUE VERBINDUNGEN[1995/50]
English:NEW COMPOUNDS[1995/50]
French:NOUVEAUX COMPOSES[1995/50]
Entry into regional phase11.08.1995National basic fee paid 
11.08.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
11.08.1995Examination requested  [1995/50]
18.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.11.1998Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
30.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
12.11.1999Fee for grant paid
12.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Request for further processing for:12.11.1999Request for further processing filed
12.11.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.12.1999Decision despatched
29.12.1998Request for further processing filed
29.12.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
30.04.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
24.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
03.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
ES19.04.2000
FR19.04.2000
GR19.04.2000
IT19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
DK19.07.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2006/14]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
ES19.04.2000
FR19.04.2000
GR19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
DK19.07.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
Former [2004/07]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
ES19.04.2000
GR19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
DK19.07.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2003/45]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
ES19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
DK19.07.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2003/08]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
ES19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2002/26]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
ES19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2002/13]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2002/02]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2001/26]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2001/16]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2001/11]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
Cited inInternational search[AX]  - Preparative Biochemistry, Volume 19, No. 2, 1989, WILLIAM P. TODD et al., "Preparation of 4-Halo-3-Hydroxyanthranilates and Demonstration of their Inhibition of 3-Hydroxyanthranilate Oxygenase Activity in Rat and Human Brain Tissue", page 155 - page 165.,
 [A]  - J. Chem. Research (M), 1978, WOLFGANG PRINZ et al.: "A Novel Synthetic Route to Oximinoacet-2-Anisidides and their Conversion into 3-Hydroxyanthranilic Acids via 7-Methoxyisatins", page 1347 - page 1370.,