Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0639302 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0639302



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 510
11.02.2005 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
11.02.2005 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
08.02.2005 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
05.11.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.11.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.11.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.10.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.10.2004 Decision revoking the European Patent (patent proprietor) Opposition 3
28.10.2004 Decision revoking the European patent (opponent) Opposition 3
12.07.2004 Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit Opposition 1
19.03.2004 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Opposition 1
26.02.2004 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
26.02.2004 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 3
26.02.2004 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
30.01.2004 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
12.12.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.12.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.12.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.10.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.10.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.10.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.10.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.10.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.10.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 19
17.10.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
17.10.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
17.10.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 15
17.10.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 9
17.10.2003 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
17.10.2003 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 13
17.10.2003 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
17.10.2003 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.10.2003 Text intended for grant Opposition 18
17.09.2003 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
16.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
15.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2003 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
12.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 22
12.09.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
28.08.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.08.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
19.08.2003 Claims Opposition 4
19.08.2003 Claims Opposition 4
19.08.2003 Claims Opposition 4
19.08.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.08.2003 Claims Opposition 4
18.08.2003 Claims Opposition 4
18.08.2003 Claims Opposition 4
18.08.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.08.2003 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 16
14.08.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 16
07.08.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.07.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.07.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.06.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.06.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.06.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.06.2003 Annex to the communication Opposition 11
16.06.2003 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
16.06.2003 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
20.05.2003 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.04.2001 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
30.04.2001 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
20.04.2001 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 5
20.04.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
11.04.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
05.03.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.02.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
13.02.2001 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
09.02.2001 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
06.02.2001 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.02.2001 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
21.12.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
21.12.2000 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
18.11.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
31.10.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.10.2000 Consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 2
26.10.2000 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 2
18.10.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.10.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.10.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.10.2000 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 3
04.10.2000 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 9
23.09.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
23.05.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.05.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
01.02.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.11.1999 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
30.08.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.08.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.08.1999 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
14.04.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
14.04.1999 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.03.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.02.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
27.02.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.02.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.02.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.02.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.02.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.02.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
23.04.1998 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
07.12.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.10.1997 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
24.10.1997 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
24.10.1997 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
24.10.1997 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
13.08.1997 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
13.08.1997 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
28.07.1997 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
06.03.1997 Claims Search / examination 6
06.03.1997 Description Search / examination 2
06.03.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
28.02.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
12.02.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.02.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.12.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.11.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.07.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
11.01.1995 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.10.1994 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
15.09.1994 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
15.09.1994 Drawings Search / examination 8
15.09.1994 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 32
15.09.1994 Priority document Search / examination 10
15.09.1994 Priority document Search / examination 24
15.09.1994 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6