Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0676861

EP0676861 - BALANCING MIXER, DISTRIBUTOR AND BAND BLOCKING FILTER USED THEREFOR, AND METHOD FOR MIXING FREQUENCIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.06.2004  [2004/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/41]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ITOH, Kenji, Mits. Denki Kabushiki Kaisha
Denshi System Kenkyusho, 1-1 Ohfuna 5-chome
Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 247 / JP
02 / SIGEMATSU, Tomonori, Mits. Denki Kabushiki Kaisha
Denshi System Kenkyusho, 1-1, Ohfuna 5-chome
Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 247 / JP
03 / IIDA, Akio, Mits. Denki Kabushiki Kaisha
Denshi System Kenkyusho, 1-1, Ohfuna 5-chome
Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 247 / JP
 [2003/43]
Former [1995/41]01 / ITOH, Kenji, Mits. Denki Kabushiki Kaisha
Denshi System Kenkyusho, 1-1 Ohfuna 5-chome
Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 247 / JP
02 / SIGEMATSU, Tomonori, Mits. Denki Kabushiki Kaisha
Denshi System Kenkyusho, 1-1, Ohfuna 5-chome
Kamak, Kanagawa 247 / JP
03 / IIDA, Akio, Mits. Denki Kabushiki Kaisha
Denshi System Kenkyusho, 1-1, Ohfuna 5-chome
Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 247 / JP
Representative(s)Habasque, Etienne J. Jean-François , et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1995/41]Habasque, Etienne Joel Jean-François , et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date94909305.811.03.1994
[1995/41]
WO1994JP00395
Priority number, dateJP1993005210812.03.1993         Original published format: JP 5210893
[1995/41]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9421032
Date:15.09.1994
Language:EN
[1994/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0676861
Date:11.10.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.1994
[1995/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0676861
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP0676861
Date:29.10.2003
[2003/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.09.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.1996
ClassificationInternational:H03D7/18, H03D7/00, H03D9/06
[1995/41]
Designated contracting statesFR [1995/41]
TitleGerman:SYMMETRIERENDER MISCHER, DAZU VERWENDETE VERTEILER UND BANDSPERRE UND VERFAHREN ZUM MISCHEN VON FREQUENZEN[1995/41]
English:BALANCING MIXER, DISTRIBUTOR AND BAND BLOCKING FILTER USED THEREFOR, AND METHOD FOR MIXING FREQUENCIES[1995/41]
French:MELANGEUR D'EQUILIBRAGE, DISTRIBUTEUR, FILTRE DE BLOCAGE DE BANDE CONCU A CET EFFET, ET METHODE DE MELANGE DE FREQUENCES[1995/41]
Entry into regional phase28.04.1995Translation filed 
03.11.1994National basic fee paid 
03.11.1994Search fee paid 
03.11.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.11.1994Examination requested  [1995/41]
22.09.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.03.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2003Fee for grant paid
13.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Request for re-establishment of rights:28.04.1995Date of receipt
09.06.1995Request accepted
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
21.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
15.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
17.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5006811  (KRUGER DENNIS A [US]) [X] 1,7 * abstract * [A] 22;
 [X]JPS604317
 [XA]  - BURA P ET AL, "A BALANCED 11 GHZ HEMT UP-CONVERTER", INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM, LONG BEACH, JUNE 13 - 15, 1989. VOLUMES 1 - 3 BOUND AS ONE, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19890613), vol. 1, pages 1299 - 1302, XP000077342 [X] 1,2,7 * figure 4 * [A] 22
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850518), vol. 9, no. 115, Database accession no. (E - 315)<1838> , [X] 1 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH02151107  (NEC CORP)