Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0684803

EP0684803 - INTRAOCULAR LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.05.2001
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALLERGAN, INC.
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine, CA 92612 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]For all designated states
ALLERGAN, INC.
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine CA 92612 / US
Former [1998/04]For all designated states
ALLERGAN, INC.
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine, California 92623-9534 / US
Former [1995/49]For all designated states
ALLERGAN, INC.
2525 Dupont Drive, P.O. Box 19534
Irvine, California 92713-9534 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BRADY, Daniel, G.
26522 Sierra Vista
Mission Viejo, CA 92692 / US
02 / DOYLE, Christopher
56 Marbella
Irvine, CA 92714 / US
03 / GRISONI, Bernard, F.
21 Front Row Lane
Aliso Viejo, CA 92656 / US
[1995/49]
Representative(s)Hutchins, Michael Richard , et al
FRY HEATH & SPENCE LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley
Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/49]Hutchins, Michael Richard , et al
FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street
Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB
Application number, filing date94909819.814.02.1994
[1995/49]
WO1994US02102
Priority number, dateUS1993001993619.02.1993         Original published format: US 19936
[1995/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9418908
Date:01.09.1994
Language:EN
[1994/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0684803
Date:06.12.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.1994
[1995/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0684803
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.09.1994
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/16
[1995/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/49]
TitleGerman:INTRAOKULARLINSE[1995/49]
English:INTRAOCULAR LENS[1995/49]
French:CRISTALLIN ARTIFICIEL[1998/46]
Former [1995/49]CRISTALLIN INTRAOCULAIRE
Entry into regional phase11.09.1995National basic fee paid 
11.09.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.09.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
11.09.1995Examination requested  [1995/49]
10.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2000Fee for grant paid
06.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
17.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
25.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
21.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.07.2000
BE05.07.2000
CH05.07.2000
ES05.07.2000
GR05.07.2000
IT05.07.2000
LI05.07.2000
DK05.10.2000
PT06.10.2000
IE14.02.2001
LU14.02.2001
MC28.02.2001
[2008/05]
Former [2006/39]AT05.07.2000
BE05.07.2000
CH05.07.2000
ES05.07.2000
GR05.07.2000
LI05.07.2000
DK05.10.2000
PT06.10.2000
IE14.02.2001
LU14.02.2001
MC28.02.2001
Former [2004/39]AT05.07.2000
BE05.07.2000
CH05.07.2000
ES05.07.2000
GR05.07.2000
LI05.07.2000
DK05.10.2000
PT06.10.2000
IE14.02.2001
LU14.02.2001
Former [2004/07]AT05.07.2000
BE05.07.2000
CH05.07.2000
ES05.07.2000
GR05.07.2000
LI05.07.2000
DK05.10.2000
PT06.10.2000
IE14.02.2001
Former [2003/45]AT05.07.2000
BE05.07.2000
CH05.07.2000
ES05.07.2000
LI05.07.2000
DK05.10.2000
PT06.10.2000
IE14.02.2001
Former [2002/26]AT05.07.2000
BE05.07.2000
CH05.07.2000
ES05.07.2000
LI05.07.2000
PT06.10.2000
IE14.02.2001
Former [2002/14]AT05.07.2000
BE05.07.2000
CH05.07.2000
LI05.07.2000
PT06.10.2000
IE14.02.2001
Former [2002/02]AT05.07.2000
BE05.07.2000
CH05.07.2000
LI05.07.2000
PT06.10.2000
Former [2001/22]AT05.07.2000
BE05.07.2000
PT06.10.2000
Former [2001/18]AT05.07.2000
PT06.10.2000
Former [2001/17]AT05.07.2000
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5041134  (O'DONNELL FRANCIS E [US]) [X] 1-5,8,9,12-16,20 * column 2, line 52 - line 56; figures 1,5 * [Y] 10,11,19;
 [X]GB2181355  (STORZ INSTR CO) [X] 1-9,12-18,20;
 [A]US4878912  (CASTLEMAN LAWRENCE D [US]) [A] 1-4,9,11-15,20 * abstract * * column 4, line 35 - line 50 *;
 [A]JPS63267351  ;
 [A]US4661108  (GRENDAHL DENNIS T [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,12,13,16 * figures 1,2,5,6 *;
 [A]US4781717  (GRENDAHL DENNIS T [US]) [A] 1-3,6,17 * abstract *;
 [DPX]US5201763  (BRADY DAN G [US], et al) [DPX] 1,2,4,8-11 * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 53; figures 1-4 *;
 [PA]EP0556040  (IOLAB CORP [US]) [PA] 1,3-5,8,9,12,14-16,20 * column 3, line 23 - line 50; figures 1-3 *
 [Y]  - F.R. CHRIST ET AL., "EVALUATION OF THE CHEMICAL,OPTICAL AND MECHANICAL PROPERTIES OF ELASTOMERIC INTRAOCULAR LENS MATERIALS AND THEIR CLINICAL SIGNIFICANCE", J. CATARACT REFRACT SURG, (19890301), vol. 15, pages 176 - 184, [Y] 10,11,19 * page 176, column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 15 * * page 180, column 1, line 24 - line 28; table 5 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890222), vol. 13, no. 79, Database accession no. (C - 571)<3427> , [A] 1-5,9,12-16 * abstract *
ExaminationWO9316660