28.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] |
17.02.2006 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
26.05.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] |
04.05.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2000 [2000/25] |
20.04.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2000 [2000/23] |
11.06.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] |
06.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.03.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.12.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
18.12.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.12.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
11.12.1998 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] |
11.12.1998 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] |
22.05.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
27.04.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.02.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.02.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.12.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.10.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.08.1997 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.09.1997 [1997/39] |
30.07.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.06.1997 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
03.06.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.02.1997 |
First examination report |
|
08.02.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.03.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.11.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.01.1996 [1996/01] |
17.11.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.01.1996 [1996/01] |