Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0650298

EP0650298 - METHOD FOR CODING OR DECODING TIME-VARYING IMAGE, AND APPARATUSES FOR CODING/DECODING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/17]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KATO, Motoki, Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
02 / YAGASAKI, Yoichi, Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
03 / YONEMITSU, Jun, Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
[1995/17]
Representative(s)Cotter, Ivan John , et al
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/17]Cotter, Ivan John , et al
D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date94910538.125.03.1994
[1995/17]
WO1994JP00485
Priority number, dateJP1993006681825.03.1993         Original published format: JP 6681893
[1995/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9422268
Date:29.09.1994
Language:EN
[1994/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0650298
Date:26.04.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.1994
[1995/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0650298
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.09.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.1995
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/26, H04N7/50, H04N7/54
[1999/13]
Former International [1995/17]H04N7/13
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/17]
TitleGerman:METHODE ZUR KODIERUNG ZEITVERÄNDERLICHER BILDER UND APPARAT ZUR KODIERUNG/DEKODIERUNG[1995/17]
English:METHOD FOR CODING OR DECODING TIME-VARYING IMAGE, AND APPARATUSES FOR CODING/DECODING[1995/17]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREILS DE CODAGE ET DE DECODAGE D'UNE IMAGE ANIMEE[1995/17]
Entry into regional phase28.11.1994Translation filed 
25.11.1994National basic fee paid 
25.11.1994Search fee paid 
25.11.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.1994Examination requested  [1995/17]
05.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2000Fee for grant paid
04.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP98202440.8  / EP0888012
Opposition(s)01.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5057916  (KRAUSE EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11,17 * column 2, line 24 - line 56 * * column 3, line 29 - line 53 * * column 4, line 19 - line 36 * * column 7, line 1 - line 15 * * column 7, line 61 - column 8, line 35 * * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 49 * * claim - * * figure 5 * [A] 12-16,18-22;
 [XAY]EP0499088  (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [X] 11,17 * column 2, line 40 - line 50 * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 14 * * column 4, line 32 - line 49 * * column 10, line 51 - column 12, line 26 * * column 13, line 20 - line 37 * * claims 18,19 * * figure 2 * [A] 5,6,12,14,15,18,20,21 [Y] 1-4,7,8;
 [A]EP0479511  (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [A] 1-8,11,12,14,15,17,18,20,21 * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 22 * * claim - * * figures 2,6 *;
 [A]EP0169709  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4,5,11,14,17,20 * page 11, line 15 - page 12, line 19 * * claims 1,2 * * figure 1 *;
 [PA]EP0577310  (CANON KK [JP]) [PA] * column 7, line 45 - column 8, line 16 * * figure - *
 [YA]  OHTSUKA ET AL, "Development of 135 Mbit/s HDTV codec", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, AMSTERDAM NL, (199208), vol. 4, no. 4/5, pages 379 - 387, XP000293755 [Y] 1-4,7,8 * page 385, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 1 * * figure 5 * [A] 11,13,14,16,17,19,20,22

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(92)90010-D
 [A]  "ENCODING PARAMETERS OF DIGITAL TELEVISION FOR STUDIOS", CCIR-RECOMMENDATIONS AND REPORTS, (1986), pages 319 - 328, [A] 9,10 * table - *
International search[X]JPS63160486  (NEC CORP)
 [A]  - HIROSHI YASUDA auther, "International Standard of Multi-Media Coding", June 30, 1991 (30.06.91), Maruzen, pages 126 to 142.,