Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0775273

EP0775273 - BRAIDED TUBULAR GASKET WITH INTEGRAL ATTACHMENT MEANS AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/22]BRAIDED TUBULAR GASKET WITH INTEGRAL ATTACHMENT MEANS
[1999/25]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2001
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.05.2001 [2001/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Systems Protection Group Inc.
241 Welsh Pool Road Exton
Pennsylvania 19341 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/11]For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Systems Protection Group Inc.
241 Welsh Pool Road
Exton, Pennsylvania 19341 / US
Former [1998/17]For all designated states
BENTLEY-HARRIS INC.
241 Welsh Pool Road
Exton, PA 19341 / US
Former [1998/07]For all designated states
THE BENTLEY-HARRIS MANUFACTURING CO.
241 Welsh Pool Road
Lionville, Pennsylvania 19353 / US
Former [1997/22]For all designated states
T & N PLC
Bowdon House, Ashburton Road West
Trafford Park, Manchester M17 1RA / GB
For all designated states
THE BENTLEY-HARRIS MANUFACTURING CO.
241 Welsh Pool Road
Lionville, Pennsylvania 19353 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TRESSLAR, Marie C.
162 William Penn Drive
Trent Manor, Jefferson, PA 19403 / US
[1997/22]
Representative(s)Hammersley, John , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord
European Patent Attorneys
Greg's Buildings
1 Booth Street
Manchester M2 4DU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/49]Hammersley, John , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys Greg's Buildings 1 Booth Street
Manchester M2 4DU / GB
Former [1999/11]Crux, John Anthony , et al
T&N Limited, Manchester International Office Centre, Styal Road
Manchester M22 5TN / GB
Former [1997/22]Crux, John Anthony , et al
Turner & Newall plc P.O. Box 20 Ashburton Road West Trafford Park
Manchester M17 1RA / GB
Application number, filing date94911233.829.03.1994
[1997/22]
WO1994GB00652
Priority number, dateUS1993004298905.04.1993         Original published format: US 42989
[1997/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9423225
Date:13.10.1994
Language:EN
[1994/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0775273
Date:28.05.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.1994
[1997/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0775273
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.10.1994
ClassificationInternational:F16J15/02, F16J15/06, F24C15/02
[1997/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/22]
TitleGerman:GEWEBESCHLAUCHDICHTUNG MIT INTEGRALEN BEFESTIGUNGSMITTELN UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[1999/25]
English:BRAIDED TUBULAR GASKET WITH INTEGRAL ATTACHMENT MEANS AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME[1999/25]
French:JOINT TUBULAIRE TRESSE AVEC ATTACHES INTEGREES ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[1999/25]
Former [1997/22]GEWEBESCHLAUCHDICHTUNG MIT INTEGRALEN BEFESTIGUNGSMITTELN
Former [1997/22]BRAIDED TUBULAR GASKET WITH INTEGRAL ATTACHMENT MEANS
Former [1997/22]JOINT TUBULAIRE TRESSE AVEC ATTACHES INTEGREES
Entry into regional phase22.01.1996National basic fee paid 
22.01.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.09.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.01.1996Examination requested  [1997/22]
10.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.1999Fee for grant paid
21.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
16.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
18.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.12.1995AT   M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1996
28.12.1995BE   M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1996
28.12.1995DE   M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1996
28.12.1995ES   M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1996
28.12.1995FR   M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1996
28.12.1995GB   M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1996
28.12.1995IT   M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1996
28.12.1995NL   M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1996
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
22.01.1996M01   Fee paid on   22.01.1996
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0193364  (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [A] 1-6,8 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9206267  (BENTLEY HARRIS MFG CO [US]) [A] 1-6,8 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0502579  (BENTLEY HARRIS MFG CO [US]) [A] 1-6,8 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2389811  (FRESSYNET JEAN [FR]) [A] 1,4 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [AD]US3578764  (NUNNALLY ROBERT L, et al) [AD] 7 * column 4, line 66 - line 75; figure 2 *;
 [AD]US3846608  (VALLES B);
 [AD]US3812316  (MILBURN F);
 [AD]US2219962  (BERT REYNOLDS EDWARD, et al)