blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0710264

EP0710264 - WATER SENSITIVE HOT MELT ADHESIVE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.04.2002
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 15.12.2004  [2004/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FINDLEY ADHESIVES INC.
11320 Watertown Plank Road Wauwatosa
Wisconsin 53226-3413 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/19]For all designated states
FINDLEY ADHESIVES INC.
11320 Watertown Plank Road
Wauwatosa Wisconsin 53226-3413 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KREUSER, John A.
11320 Watertown Plank Road
Wauwatosa, Wisconsin 53226 / US
[1996/37]
Former [1996/19]01 / KREUSER, John, A.
3249 Highway K
Hartford, WI 53027 / US
Representative(s)Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al
SANDERSON & CO.
European Patent Attorneys
34, East Stockwell Street
Colchester
Essex CO1 1ST / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/19]Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al
SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street
Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB
Application number, filing date94911567.907.03.1994
[1996/19]
WO1994US02666
Priority number, dateUS1993009386320.07.1993         Original published format: US 93863
[1996/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9503361
Date:02.02.1995
Language:EN
[1995/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0710264
Date:08.05.1996
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1996/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0710264
Date:13.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.02.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.1996
ClassificationIPC:C08K5/10, C08K5/52, C09J129/10
[1996/43]
CPC:
C09J193/04 (EP,US); C08K5/0016 (EP,US); C09J129/10 (EP,US);
C08L2666/04 (EP,US); C08L2666/26 (EP,US); C08L2666/28 (EP,US);
C08L93/04 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C08K5/0016, C08L29/10 (EP,US);
C09J129/10, C08L2666/26, C08L2666/28 (US,EP);
C09J193/04, C08L2666/04 (US,EP)
Former IPC [1996/19]C08K5/10, C08K5/52
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/19]
TitleGerman:WASSEREMPFINDLICHE SCHMELZKLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG[1996/19]
English:WATER SENSITIVE HOT MELT ADHESIVE COMPOSITION[1996/19]
French:COMPOSITION FUSIBLE THERMOADHESIVE SENSIBLE A L'EAU[1996/19]
Entry into regional phase13.02.1996National basic fee paid 
13.02.1996Search fee paid 
13.02.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.02.1996Examination requested  [1996/19]
20.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
25.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.12.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.2001Fee for grant paid
12.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
03.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
01.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
19.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
26.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.199906   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.1999
31.03.200007   M06   Fee paid on   19.04.2000
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.06.2001
BE13.06.2001
CH13.06.2001
LI13.06.2001
DK13.09.2001
GR14.09.2001
PT17.09.2001
IE07.03.2002
LU07.03.2002
MC07.03.2002
[2004/51]
Former [2004/39]AT13.06.2001
BE13.06.2001
CH13.06.2001
LI13.06.2001
DK13.09.2001
PT17.09.2001
IE07.03.2002
LU07.03.2002
MC07.03.2002
Former [2003/45]AT13.06.2001
BE13.06.2001
CH13.06.2001
LI13.06.2001
DK13.09.2001
PT17.09.2001
IE07.03.2002
MC07.03.2002
Former [2003/25]AT13.06.2001
BE13.06.2001
CH13.06.2001
LI13.06.2001
PT17.09.2001
IE07.03.2002
MC07.03.2002
Former [2003/17]AT13.06.2001
BE13.06.2001
CH13.06.2001
LI13.06.2001
PT17.09.2001
IE07.03.2002
Former [2002/26]AT13.06.2001
BE13.06.2001
CH13.06.2001
LI13.06.2001
PT17.09.2001
Former [2002/15]AT13.06.2001
BE13.06.2001
CH13.06.2001
LI13.06.2001
Former [2002/12]BE13.06.2001
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US3345320  (UFFNER MELVILLE W, et al);
 [A]US4595737  (STRAUB FERDINAND [DE], et al);
 [Y]US5080978  (KULZICK MATTHEW A [US], et al);
 [A]US5149741  (ALPER MARK D [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.