Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0700334

EP0700334 - FILTERING MEMBER FOR IMPLANTING IN GLAUCOMA SURGERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/11]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPLANTING AN ARTIFICIAL MESHWORK IN GLAUCOMA SURGERY
[2001/41]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF MIAMI
P.O. Box 016960 (M811), 1400 N.W.10th Avenue, Miami
Florida 33101 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/11]For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF MIAMI
P.O. Box 016960 (M811), 1400 N.W.10th Avenue
Miami, Florida 33101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SIMON, Gabriel
Maestre Nicolau 23 6A
E-08021 Barcelona / ES
02 / LEGEAIS, Jean-Marc
18, chaussée de l'Etang
F-94011 Saint-Mandé / FR
03 / LEE, William
201 Palm Avenue
Miami Beach, FL 33138 / US
04 / PAREL, Jean-Marie
332 N.E. 92 Street
Miami Shores, FL 33138 / US
[1996/11]
Representative(s)Laight, Martin Harvey
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/11]Laight, Martin Harvey
W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
Application number, filing date94912308.714.03.1994
[1996/11]
WO1994US03260
Priority number, dateUS1993003487019.03.1993         Original published format: US 34870
[1996/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9421443
Date:29.09.1994
Language:EN
[1994/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0700334
Date:13.03.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.1994
[1996/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0700334
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.09.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:B29C53/00, A61M5/00, A61F9/00
[1997/19]
Former International [1996/11]B29C53/00, A61M5/00
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/11]
TitleGerman:FILTERGLIED ZUM IMPLANTIEREN BEI GLAUCOMAOPERATIONEN[2001/41]
English:FILTERING MEMBER FOR IMPLANTING IN GLAUCOMA SURGERY[2001/41]
French:ELEMENT DE FILTRE POUR IMPLANTATION EN CHIRURGIE DU GLAUCOME[2001/41]
Former [1996/11]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM IMPLANTIEREN VON KÜNSTLICHEM GEWEBE BEI GLAUCOMAOPERATIONEN
Former [1996/11]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPLANTING AN ARTIFICIAL MESHWORK IN GLAUCOMA SURGERY
Former [1996/11]METHODE ET DISPOSITIF D'IMPLANTATION D'UN TISSU ARTIFICIEL MAILLE EN CHIRURGIE DU GLAUCOME
Entry into regional phase24.07.1995National basic fee paid 
24.07.1995Search fee paid 
24.07.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.09.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.07.1995Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.07.1995Examination requested  [1996/11]
13.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.02.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2002Fee for grant paid
20.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP98113460.4  / EP0881055
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
06.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
07.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
21.03.200108   M02   Fee paid on   14.05.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE18.06.2003
NL18.06.2003
[2004/28]
Former [2004/02]NL18.06.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]US5037379  (CLAYMAN RALPH V [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 19; figures 1B,8 *;
 [A]FR2638349  (BREARD FRANCIS [FR]) [A] 1,3,5,6 * page 2, line 15 - line 30 * * page 3, line 1 - line 4; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]WO9112037  (AHMED ABDUL MATEEN [US]) [A] 1,5 * page 10, line 6 - page 11, paragraph 3; figure 1 *;
 [A]GB2156684  (BINDER PERRY SCOTT) [A] 5 * abstract *;
 [X]WO9301755  (EATON ALEXANDER M [US], et al) [X] 16 * page 16, line 30 - page 17, line 27; figure 24 *;
 [X]US4642090  (UTRATA PETER J [US]) [X] 16 * column 2, line 46 - line 60; figures 1,3 *;
 [X]US4552146  (JENSEN RONALD P [US], et al) [X] 16 * column 3, line 52 - line 61; figure 7 *;
 [A]US5180362  (WORST J G F [NL]) [A] 16 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0186632  (CITIC SRL [IT]) [A] 16 * figure 2 *
 [A]  HYUN BONG BAE ET AL., "A membranous drainage implant in glaucoma filtering surgery: animal trial", KOR. J. OPHTHALMOL., (1988), vol. 2, pages 49 - 56, XP002027714 [A] 1,5 * page 50; figure 1 *
International search[XY]US4617081  (BLEAU CHARLES D [US], et al);
 [Y]US4347091  (HAUCK KARL, et al);
 [A]US4946436  (SMITH STEWART G [US]);
 [A]US5178604  (BAERVELDT GEORGE [US], et al);
 [A]US4936825  (UNGERLEIDER BRUCE A [US]);
 [A]SU1718913  (MEZHOTRASLEVOJ NT KOMPLEKS MIK [SU])
 [A]  - Ophthalmology, Volume 94, No. 9, September 1987, E.J. ROCKWOOD et al., "Glaucoma Filtering Surgery with 5-Fluorouracil", pages 1071-1078, especially Abstract.,