Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0695352

EP0695352 - DNA ENCODING COBRA C3, CVF1, AND CVF2 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
3900 Reservoir Road NW
Washington, DC 20007 / US
[1996/06]
Inventor(s)01 / FRITZINGER, David C.
6177 Old Brentford Ct.
Alexandria, VA 22310 / US
02 / BREDEHORST, Reinhard
Eichenstrasse 62
D-20255 Hamburg 20 / DE
03 / VOGEL, Carl-Wilhelm
Heimhuder Strasse 13
D-20148 Hamburg / DE
[1996/06]
Representative(s)Poulin, Gérard , et al
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Poulin, Gérard , et al
Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2003/19]Poulin, Gérard , et al
BREVALEX 3, rue du docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [1996/06]Dubois-Chabert, Guy , et al
Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date94912343.407.04.1994
[1996/06]
WO1994US03441
Priority number, dateUS1993004374707.04.1993         Original published format: US 43747
[1996/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9423024
Date:13.10.1994
[1994/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0695352
Date:07.02.1996
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.1994
[1996/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.10.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/07, C12N15/11, C12N15/57
[1996/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/06]
TitleGerman:DNA KODIEREND FÜR COBRA C3, VCF1 UND CVF2[1996/06]
English:DNA ENCODING COBRA C3, CVF1, AND CVF2[1996/06]
French:ADN CODANT COBRA C3, CVF1, ET CVF2[1996/06]
Entry into regional phase06.11.1995National basic fee paid 
06.11.1995Search fee paid 
06.11.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.11.1995Examination requested  [1996/06]
20.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/16]
13.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200310   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]  FRITZINGER D C ET AL, "SEQUENCE ANALYSIS OF COBRA VENOM FACTOR MESSENGER RNA REVEALS THE EXISTENCE OF TWO DIFFERENT MESSENGER RNA SPECIES", COMPLEMENT AND INFLAMMATION, (1991), vol. 8, no. 3-4, ISSN 1012-8204, page 152, XP000941164 [A] * the whole document *
 [T]  FRITZINGER ET AL, "Molecular cloning and derived primary structure of cobra venom factor", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,US,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, (19941201), vol. 91, no. 26, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 12775 - 12779, XP002093056 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.26.12775
International search[XY]  - The Journal of Immunology, Volume 149, Number 11, issued December 1, 1992, FRITZINGER et al., "Primary Structure of Cobra Complement Component C3", pages 3554-3562, especially pages 3554, 3556 and 3561.,