Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0698219

EP0698219 - METHOD FOR I.A. MESURING THE THICKNESS OF PLATE CONSTRUCTIONS AND PIPES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SINVENT A/S
N-7034 Trondheim / NO
For all designated states
FRED OLSEN & CO.
P.O. Box 1159 - Sentrum
0107 Oslo / NO
[2000/22]
Former [1996/09]For all designated states
SINVENT A/S
N-7034 Trondheim / NO
For all designated states
FRED OLSEN & CO.
P.O. Box 1159 - Sentrum
N-0107 Oslo / NO
Inventor(s)01 / WAAG, Tor, Inge
Skansegt. 24
N-7014 Trondheim / NO
02 / OLSEN, Anette, S.
Huldreveien 7B
N-0389 Oslo / NO
[1996/09]
Representative(s)Avellan-Hultman, Olle
Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB Box 10316
100 55 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [1996/09]Avellan-Hultman, Olle
Avellan-Hultman Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 5366
S-102 49 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date94912708.817.03.1994
[1996/09]
WO1994NO00060
Priority number, dateNO1993000129502.04.1993         Original published format: NO 931295
[1996/09]
Filing languageNO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9423311
Date:13.10.1994
[1994/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0698219
Date:28.02.1996
[1996/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0698219
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE13.10.1994
ClassificationInternational:G01S15/89
[1996/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/09]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER DICKE VON PLATTENKONSTRUKTIONEN UND ROHREN[1996/09]
English:METHOD FOR I.A. MESURING THE THICKNESS OF PLATE CONSTRUCTIONS AND PIPES[1996/09]
French:PROCEDE DE MESURE DE L'EPAISSEUR DE CONSTRUCTION EN PLAQUES ET DE CONDUITS[1996/09]
Entry into regional phase13.10.1994Translation filed 
02.11.1995National basic fee paid 
02.11.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
02.11.1995Examination requested  [1996/10]
27.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.1999Fee for grant paid
15.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.05.2000
[2001/11]
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5047990  (GAFOS ADAMANDIOS G [US], et al);
 [Y]US4441369  (LESSARD DENNIS E [US], et al);
 [Y]US4596144  (PANTON STANLEY [CA], et al);
 [A]EP0352117  (AKAD TEKN VIDENSKABER [DK])
ExaminationUS4212258