Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0691001

EP0691001 - WATER-DEVELOPABLE PHOTOSENSITIVE PLATES ESPECIALLY SUITED FOR COMMERCIAL FLEXOGRAPHIC PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 01.07.2009  [2009/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NAPP SYSTEMS, INC.
360 South Pacific Street
San Marcos, CA 92069-3886 / US
[1996/02]
Inventor(s)01 / KELSALL, Robert, W.
14307 Barrymore Street
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
02 / MAURER, Allyson, R.
2361 Country View Glen
Escondido, CA 92026 / US
[1996/02]
Representative(s)Fiener, Josef , et al
Patentanw. J. Fiener et col.
P.O. Box 12 49
87712 Mindelheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/27]Fiener, Josef , et al
Patentanw. J. Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49
87712 Mindelheim / DE
Former [1996/02]Fiener, Josef , et al
Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener & Sturm P.O. Box 12 49
D-87712 Mindelheim / DE
Application number, filing date94912816.921.03.1994
[1996/02]
WO1994US03024
Priority number, dateUS1993003698425.03.1993         Original published format: US 36984
[1996/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9422057
Date:29.09.1994
Language:EN
[1994/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0691001
Date:10.01.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.1994
[1996/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0691001
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.09.1994
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/027, G03F7/033
[1996/02]
Designated contracting statesDE [1996/02]
TitleGerman:FOTOEMPFINDLICHE, MIT WASSER ENTWICKELBARE DRUCKPLATTEN FÜR DEN FLEXODRUCK[2002/01]
English:WATER-DEVELOPABLE PHOTOSENSITIVE PLATES ESPECIALLY SUITED FOR COMMERCIAL FLEXOGRAPHIC PRINTING[1996/02]
French:PLAQUES PHOTOSENSIBLES POUVANT ETRE DEVELOPPEES DANS L'EAU, ET CONVENANT PARTICULIEREMENT A L'IMPRESSION FLEXOGRAPHIQUE INDUSTRIELLE[1996/02]
Former [1996/02]FOTOEMPFINDLICHE, MIT WASSERENTWICKELBARE DRUCKPLATTEN FÜR DEN FLEXODRUCK
Entry into regional phase23.10.1995National basic fee paid 
23.10.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.10.1995Examination requested  [1996/02]
17.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
14.12.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.06.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
06.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2002Fee for grant paid
26.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50]
Request for further processing for:05.09.2001Request for further processing filed
05.09.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.10.2001Decision despatched
07.08.1998Request for further processing filed
07.08.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.08.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200108   M06   Fee paid on   01.10.2001
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO8802135  (NAPP SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-20 * page 6, line 7 - line 37 * * page 7, line 1 - line 2; claim - *;
 [Y]EP0367086  (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-20 * page 5, line 46 - line 58; claims 1,6 * * page 6, line 1 - line 4 *;
 [A]US5143819  (MIRLE SRINIVAS K [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 4, line 56 - line 67; claims 1,8 * * column 5, line 1 - line 38 *;
 [A]EP0295944  (NAPP SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 3, line 33 - line 47; claim - *