Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0695420

EP0695420 - MONITORING SOIL COMPACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 12.03.2014  [2014/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GAS RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.
8600 West Bryn Mawr Avenue
Chicago, IL 60631-3562 / US
[1996/06]
Inventor(s)01 / HEIRTZLER, Frank, J.
3 Connors Street
Londonderry, NH 03053 / US
02 / CARDENAS, Robert, L.
12 August Drive
Framingham, MA 01701 / US
03 / GEORGE, David, M.
99 Simpson Road
Marlboro, MA 01752 / US
04 / PASCH, Kenneth, A.
1142 Oakdale Avenue, 3
Chicago, IL 60657 / US
05 / DEGUIRE, Daniel, R.
64 Milk Street
Blackstone, MA 01504 / US
[1996/06]
Representative(s)Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte
Beethovenstrasse 49
Postfach
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/30]Patentanwaltsbüro Feldmann AG
Kanalstrasse 17
8152 Glattbrugg / CH
Former [1996/06]Righetti, Giuseppe , et al
Bugnion S.p.A. Via Carlo Farini, 81
I-20159 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date94914190.715.04.1994
[1996/06]
WO1994US04182
Priority number, dateUS1993004907620.04.1993         Original published format: US 49076
[1996/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9424538
Date:27.10.1994
[1994/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0695420
Date:07.02.1996
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.1994
[1996/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0695420
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.10.1994
ClassificationInternational:G01N3/30, G01N33/24
[1996/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1996/06]
TitleGerman:UEBERWACHUNG DER VERDICHTUNG VON ERDREICH[1996/06]
English:MONITORING SOIL COMPACTION[1996/06]
French:SURVEILLANCE DU COMPACTAGE D'UN SOL[1996/06]
Entry into regional phase31.10.1995National basic fee paid 
31.10.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
31.10.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.09.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.11.1995Examination requested  [1996/06]
25.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.1999Fee for grant paid
21.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.05.199805   M06   Fee paid on   11.05.1998
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.02.2000
BE02.02.2000
IT02.02.2000
NL02.02.2000
DK02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
[2014/11]
Former [2008/05]AT02.02.2000
BE02.02.2000
IT02.02.2000
NL02.02.2000
DK02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2003/45]AT02.02.2000
BE02.02.2000
NL02.02.2000
DK02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2003/08]AT02.02.2000
BE02.02.2000
NL02.02.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2001/09]AT02.02.2000
BE02.02.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2001/08]AT02.02.2000
BE02.02.2000
Cited inInternational search[DXAY]WO9114182  (FOSTER MILLER INC [US]) [DX] 1,2 * abstract * * page 6, line 22 - page 14, line 16 * [DA] 7-10 [DY] 3;
 [YA]WO9302253  (WACKER WERKE KG [DE]) [Y] 3 * page 4, paragraph 1; claim - * [A] 7,8;
 [A]GB2258923  (AMERADA HESS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2,4,7,8,12,13 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB1524445  (UNIV WESTERN AUSTRALIA) [A] 1,2,7-9 * claim 4 *