Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0695494

EP0695494 - ELECTRONIC MODULE COMPRISING A STACK OF IC CHIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.12.2001
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.02.2002  [2002/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IRVINE SENSORS CORPORATION
3001 Redhill Avenue, Bldg. 3
Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US
[1996/06]
Inventor(s)01 / CARSON, John, C.
2921 Setting Sun Drive
Corona del Mar, CA 92625 / US
02 / SOME, Raphael, R.
30 Read Road
Williston, VT 05495 / US
[1996/06]
Representative(s)Fiener, Josef
Patentanw. J. Fiener et col.
P.O. Box 12 49
87712 Mindelheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/06]Fiener, Josef
Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener & Sturm P.O. Box 12 49
D-87712 Mindelheim / DE
Application number, filing date94915397.719.04.1994
[1996/06]
WO1994US04322
Priority number, dateUS1993005247523.04.1993         Original published format: US 52475
[1996/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9426083
Date:10.11.1994
[1994/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0695494
Date:07.02.1996
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.1994
[1996/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0695494
Date:14.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.11.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/00, H01L25/065
[1997/16]
Former International [1996/06]H05K7/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/06]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHES MODUL MIT EINEM STAPEL VON IC-CHIPS[1996/06]
English:ELECTRONIC MODULE COMPRISING A STACK OF IC CHIPS[1996/06]
French:MODULE ELECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT UN EMPILAGE DE PUCES A CIRCUIT INTEGRE[1996/06]
Entry into regional phase23.10.1995National basic fee paid 
23.10.1995Search fee paid 
23.10.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
23.10.1995Examination requested  [1996/06]
17.04.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.08.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2000Fee for grant paid
31.10.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.11.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
27.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0354708  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC) [X] 1 * column 4, line 48 - line 58; figures 9,11; claims 1,8,10 * [A] 13
International search[Y]US4983533