Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0803163 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0803163



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 487
06.02.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
21.06.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
12.05.2010 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
12.06.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.05.2009 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
19.05.2009 Preparation of grant Search / examination 1
19.05.2009 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
10.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 8
10.04.2009 Claims Search / examination 8
10.04.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 10
10.04.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 13
10.04.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.04.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.04.2009 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
16.12.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.12.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
16.12.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.12.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 40
15.10.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
29.08.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
27.08.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
27.08.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.08.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 25
14.08.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 25
07.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
04.06.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 11
28.05.2008 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 2
28.05.2008 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
30.04.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 28
03.03.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.02.2008 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 17
31.01.2008 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
07.01.2008 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
05.12.2006 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
16.11.2006 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
07.11.2006 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
09.10.2006 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
11.08.2006 Notice on debiting of fees Appeal 1
31.07.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
16.06.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
12.06.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.06.2006 Decision to refuse according to the state of the file Search / examination 2
02.06.2006 Means of redress Search / examination 1
26.05.2006 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
18.05.2006 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.05.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
12.05.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
13.04.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
20.02.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
15.02.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.02.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
08.02.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.02.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
11.07.2005 Claims Search / examination 8
11.07.2005 Claims Search / examination 8
11.07.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.04.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.04.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.12.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
30.12.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.03.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
19.02.2004 Claims Search / examination 8
19.02.2004 Claims Search / examination 8
19.02.2004 Description Search / examination 3
19.02.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.02.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.02.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 22
09.02.2004 Request for change of name Search / examination 7
02.01.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.12.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.12.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.08.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
19.08.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.04.2003 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
09.04.2003 Claims Search / examination 9
09.04.2003 Claims Search / examination 1
09.04.2003 Request for further processing Search / examination 3
04.04.2003 Request for further processing Search / examination 13
28.01.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
11.10.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.10.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.10.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.06.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
12.06.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.06.1998 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
12.05.1998 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
30.04.1998 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
20.04.1998 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
01.04.1998 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.04.1998 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 16
10.06.1997 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
24.03.1997 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.01.1997 Invitation to pay claims fees Search / examination 1
14.10.1996 Claims Search / examination 11
14.10.1996 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.10.1996 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
09.07.1996 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 11
09.07.1996 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
05.12.1995 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
02.11.1995 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
02.11.1995 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 48