Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0702551

EP0702551 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REPARATION AND PREVENTION OF FIBROTIC LESIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 18.04.2007  [2007/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MARGOLIN, Solomon B.
6723 Desco Drive
Dallas, TX 75225 / US
[1996/13]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1996/13]
Representative(s)Harrison, Ivor Stanley , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/23]Harrison, Ivor Stanley , et al
Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn
London EC1N 2JT / GB
Former [1996/13]Baker, Colin John , et al
Withers & Rogers, 4 Dyer's Buildings, Holborn
London EC1N 2JT / GB
Application number, filing date94916710.009.05.1994
[1996/13]
WO1994US05156
Priority number, dateUS1993005921407.05.1993         Original published format: US 59214
US1993006483119.05.1993         Original published format: US 64831
[1996/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9426249
Date:24.11.1994
Language:EN
[1994/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0702551
Date:27.03.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.1994
[1996/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0702551
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.11.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/44, A61K31/47, A61P19/04
[2001/51]
Former International [1997/33]A61K31/44, A61K31/47
Former International [1996/13]A61K9/02, A61K9/08, A61K9/10, A61K9/14, A61K9/20, A61K9/48
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/13]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR REPARATUR UND VORBEUGUNG FIBROTISCHER VERLETZUNGEN[1996/13]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR REPARATION AND PREVENTION OF FIBROTIC LESIONS[1996/13]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES DE REPARATION ET DE PREVENTION DE LESIONS DU TYPE FIBROSE[1996/13]
Entry into regional phase05.12.1995National basic fee paid 
05.12.1995Search fee paid 
05.12.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.12.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.12.1995Examination requested  [1996/13]
09.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.09.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
08.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
19.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.07.2002Fee for grant paid
08.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Request for further processing for:01.10.1999Request for further processing filed
01.10.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.10.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
18.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
21.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.199603   M06   Fee paid on   09.08.1996
31.05.199906   M06   Fee paid on   11.10.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
IE09.05.2003
LU09.05.2003
[2007/16]
Former [2004/39]GR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
IE09.05.2003
LU09.05.2003
Former [2004/29]GR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
IE09.05.2003
Former [2003/29]GR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/20]GR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE25.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0383591  (YAMAUCHI SHITOTOMO [JP]) [X] 1-8,10,11 * the whole document *
International search[EA]US5310562  (MARGOLIN SOLOMON B [US]);
 [A]US3974281  (GADEKAR SHREEKRISHNA M)
ExaminationUS4042699