Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0702557

EP0702557 - THERAPEUTIC INHIBITOR OF VASCULAR SMOOTH MUSCLE CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  16.01.2009
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.01.2009Refusal of applicationpublished on 18.02.2009  [2009/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Poniard Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
410 West Harrison Street
Seattle WA 98119 / US
[2007/02]
Former [1996/13]For all designated states
NEORX CORPORATION
410 West Harrison Street
Seattle Washington 98119 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KUNZ, Lawrence Leroy
2310 - 223rd Court N.E.
Redmond, WA 98053 / US
02 / KLEIN, Richard A.
6620 162nd Place, Southwest
Lynnwood, WA 98037 / US
03 / RENO, John M.
2452 Elm Drive
Brier, WA 98036 / US
04 / RENO, John M.
2452 Elm Drive
Brier, WA 98036 / US
05 / METCALFE, James C.
20 Luard Road
Cambridge CB2 2PJ / GB
06 / WEISSBERG, Peter L.
116 Shelford Road
Cambridge CB2 2NF / GB
07 / ANDERSON, Peter G.
406 Delcris Drive
Birmingham, AL 35226 / US
[1996/26]
Former [1996/13]01 / KUNZ, Lawrence Leroy
1822 235th Place, Northeast
Redmond, WA 98053 / US
02 / KLEIN, Richard A.
6620 162nd Place, Southwest
Lynnwood, WA 98037 / US
03 / RENO, John M.
2452 Elm Drive
Brier, WA 98036 / US
04 / RENO, John M.
2452 Elm Drive
Brier, WA 98036 / US
05 / METCALFE, James C.
20 Luard Road
Cambridge CB2 2PJ / GB
06 / WEISSBERG, Peter L.
116 Shelford Road
Cambridge CB2 2NF / GB
07 / ANDERSON, Peter G.
406 Delcris Drive
Birmingham, AL 35226 / US
Representative(s)Schwarz, Albin , et al
Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstraße 30
1010 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2006/08]Schwarz, Albin , et al
Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 32/22
1010 Wien / AT
Former [1996/13]Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva
Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UZ / GB
Application number, filing date94916743.112.05.1994
[1996/13]
WO1994US05266
Priority number, dateUS1993006245113.05.1993         Original published format: US 62451
[1996/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9426291
Date:24.11.1994
Language:EN
[1994/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0702557
Date:27.03.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.1994
[1996/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.11.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/00, A61K31/135, A61K47/48
[1998/22]
Former International [1996/13]A61K37/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/13]
TitleGerman:EIN INHIBITOR FÜR GLATTE GEFÄSSMUSKELZELLEN FÜR THERAPEUTISCHE NUTZUNG[1996/13]
English:THERAPEUTIC INHIBITOR OF VASCULAR SMOOTH MUSCLE CELLS[1996/13]
French:INHIBITEURS DES CELLULES DES MUSCLES VASCULAIRES LISSES, A USAGE THERAPEUTIQUE[1996/13]
Entry into regional phase13.12.1995National basic fee paid 
13.12.1995Search fee paid 
13.12.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
13.12.1995Examination requested  [1996/13]
29.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
10.02.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
21.12.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/26]
14.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
deletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/46]
19.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
18.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
27.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
18.09.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.09.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/08]
30.09.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/08]
Divisional application(s)EP04077621.3  / EP1510220
Request for further processing for:04.03.2005Request for further processing filed
04.03.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.03.2005Decision despatched
27.02.2004Request for further processing filed
27.02.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.03.2004Decision despatched
01.03.2004Request for further processing filed
27.02.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.03.2004Decision despatched
14.03.2001Request for further processing filed
14.03.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.03.2001Decision despatched
10.02.2000Request for further processing filed
10.02.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.02.2000Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
20.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
05.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 11
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 12
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 13
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 14
28.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[X]  - GRAINGER, DAVID J. ET AL, "Tamoxifen decreases the rate of proliferation of rat vascular smooth - muscle cells in culture by inducing production of transforming growth factor.beta.", BIOCHEM. J. (1993), 294(1), 109-12 CODEN: BIJOAK;ISSN: 0306-3275, (1993), XP002061173 [X] 1-26 * the whole document *
 [X]  - MCCAFFREY T A ET AL, "Fucoidan is a non-anticoagulant inhibitor of intimal hyperplasia.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, USA, (199204), vol. 184, no. 2, pages 773 - 781, XP002061174 [X] 1-26 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(92)90657-7
 [A]  - LEHMANN K ET AL, "Effect of cilazapril on the proliferative response after vascular damage.", J OF CARDIOVASCULAR PHARMACOLOGY, USA, (1993), vol. 22, no. SUPPL 4, pages S19 - 24, XP002061175

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00005344-199322004-00004
 [A]  - MAJESKY M W ET AL, "Production of transforming growth factor beta 1 during repair of arterial injury.", J OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, USA, (1991), vol. 88, no. 3, pages 904 - 910, XP002061176
International search[Y]US5171217
 [Y]  - PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGY, issued November 1984, T.R. TICE et al., "Biodegradable controlled-release parenteral systems", pages 26-35, see entire document.
 [Y]  - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, Vol. 88, issued September 1991, CRISSMAN et al., "Transformed mammalian cells are deficient in kinase-mediated control of progression through the G(1) phase of the cell cycle", pages 7580-7584, see entire document.
 [Y]  - MEDLINE ABSTRACTS, issued 15 June 1988, JUNG et al., "Platelet cytoskeletal protein distributions in two triton-insoluble fractions and how they are affected by stimulants and reagents that modify cytoskeletal protein interactions", see abstract no. 88322229, Thromb. Res. 50 (6) 775-787.
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 94, issued 1981, JANDE et al., "Effects of cytochalasin B and dihydrocytochalasin B on calcium transport by intestinal absorptive cells", abstract no. 189223, Calcif. Tissue Int. 33(2), 143-151.
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 76, issued 1972, MANASEK et al., "Sensitivity of developing cardiac myofibrils to cytochalasin-B", Abstract No. 149535, Proceeding of the National Academy of Sciences, Vol. 69(2), 303-312.