Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0702682

EP0702682 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF AMINO ACID ESTERS OF NUCLEOSIDE ANALOGUES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/13]AMINO ACID ESTER OF NUCLEOSIDE ANALOGUES
[2000/20]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.01.2002
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 27.09.2006  [2006/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROLABO SL
Poligono Industrial Malpica, Santa Isabel, calle 5, parcelas 3y4
50016 Zaragoza / ES
[1997/40]
Former [1996/13]For all designated states
FARMHISPANIA S.A.
Pharmaceutical Fine Chemicals, P.O. Box 8068
E-08080 Barcelona / ES
Inventor(s)01 / JACKSON, William, Paul
92 Nightingale Lane
Bromley Kent BR1 2SE / GB
[1996/13]
Representative(s)Cockbain, Julian , et al
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/40]Cockbain, Julian, Dr. , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [1996/13]Cockbain, Julian, Dr.
Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UZ / GB
Application number, filing date94917117.709.06.1994
[1996/13]
WO1994GB01245
Priority number, dateGB1993001195210.06.1993         Original published format: GB 9311952
GB1993002064507.10.1993         Original published format: GB 9320645
[1996/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9429311
Date:22.12.1994
Language:EN
[1994/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0702682
Date:27.03.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.1994
[1996/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0702682
Date:14.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/11]
Search report(s)International search reportEP22.12.1994
ClassificationInternational:C07D473/00
[1996/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/13]
Extension statesSI16.12.1995
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AMINOSÄUREESTER VON NUKLEOSID ANALOGEN[2000/20]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF AMINO ACID ESTERS OF NUCLEOSIDE ANALOGUES[2000/20]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ESTER AMINOACIDE D'UN ANALOGUE DE NUCLEOSIDE[2000/20]
Former [1996/13]AMINOSÄUREESTER VON NUKLEOSID ANALOGEN
Former [1996/13]AMINO ACID ESTER OF NUCLEOSIDE ANALOGUES
Former [1996/13]ESTER AMINOACIDE D'UN ANALOGUE DE NUCLEOSIDE
Entry into regional phase16.12.1995National basic fee paid 
16.12.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.12.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.12.1995Examination requested  [1996/13]
06.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.09.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2001Fee for grant paid
02.01.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.12.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
25.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.03.2001
GR14.03.2001
LU09.06.2001
DK14.06.2001
SE14.06.2001
PT15.06.2001
MC30.06.2001
[2006/39]
Former [2004/39]AT14.03.2001
GR14.03.2001
LU09.06.2001
DK14.06.2001
SE14.06.2001
PT15.06.2001
Former [2004/07]AT14.03.2001
GR14.03.2001
DK14.06.2001
SE14.06.2001
PT15.06.2001
Former [2003/45]AT14.03.2001
DK14.06.2001
SE14.06.2001
PT15.06.2001
Former [2002/26]AT14.03.2001
SE14.06.2001
PT15.06.2001
Former [2002/10]AT14.03.2001
SE14.06.2001
Former [2002/05]SE14.06.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0375329  (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) [A] 9 *Page 10-12 : claims*;
 [DA]EP0099493  (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) [DA] 9 *Page 25-28 : claims*;
 [DA]EP0308065  (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) [DA] 9 *Page 15-17 : claims*;
 [PA]EP0596542  (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) [PA] 9 *Page *
 [A]  - LEON COLLA ET AL, JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (198304), vol. 26, no. 4, pages 602 - 604, [A] 9 *Article*
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920914), vol. 117, no. 11, Database accession no. 103632w, [A] 9 * abstract *
    [] - ANTIVIRAL CHEM. CHEMOTHER., (1992), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 157 - 164,