Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0745128

EP0745128 - HEPATITIS B VIRUS MUTANTS, REAGENTS AND METHODS FOR DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.09.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.09.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.10.2004  [2004/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
One Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park IL 60064-3500 / US
For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY COURT OF THE UNIVERSITY OF GLASGOW
University Avenue
Glasgow G12 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/17]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
One Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US
For all designated states
The University Court of the University of Glasgow
University Avenue
Glasgow G12 8QQ / GB
Former [2003/45]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
One Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US
For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF GLASGOW
The University Court, University Avenue
Glasgow G12 8QQ / GB
Former [2003/44]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
One Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US
For all designated states
The University of Glasgow
The University Court, University Avenue
Glasgow G12 8QQ / GB
Former [1996/49]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
One Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US
For all designated states
The University of Glasgow, University Court
The University
Glasgow G12 8QQ, Scotland / GB
Inventor(s)01 / CARMAN, William
148 Queens Dr. Queens Park
Glasglow G42 8QN / GB
02 / DECKER, Richard H.
924 Castlewood Lane
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
03 / WALLACE, Lesley
23 Crathie Drive
Thornwood Glasgow G11 7XE / GB
04 / MIMMS, Larry T.
8 Shoshoni Trail
Lake Villa, IL 60046 / US
05 / SOLOMON, Larry R.
64 S. Emerald Avenue
Mundelein, IL 60060 / US
[1996/49]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/49]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date94917325.609.05.1994
[1996/49]
WO1994US05090
Priority number, dateUS1993005903107.05.1993         Original published format: US 59031
[1996/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9426904
Date:24.11.1994
Language:EN
[1994/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0745128
Date:04.12.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.1994
[1996/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0745128
Date:29.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/44]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP0745128
Date:14.07.2004
[2004/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.11.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/51, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12N7/00, C12P21/00, A61K39/29, C12Q1/70, C12Q1/68, C07K14/08
[2002/31]
Former International [1996/49]C12N15/51, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12N7/00, C12P21/00, A61K39/29, C12Q1/70, C12Q1/68, C07K7/10, C07K13/00, C07K15/06
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1996/49]
TitleGerman:HEPATITIS-B-VIRUSMUTANTEN, UND VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR IHRE BESTIMMUNG[1996/49]
English:HEPATITIS B VIRUS MUTANTS, REAGENTS AND METHODS FOR DETECTION[1996/49]
French:MUTANTS DU VIRUS DE L'HEPATITE B, REACTIFS ET PROCEDES DE DETECTION[1996/49]
Entry into regional phase23.11.1995National basic fee paid 
23.11.1995Search fee paid 
23.11.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.11.1995Examination requested  [1996/49]
23.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
07.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
21.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2003Fee for grant paid
25.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
06.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
08.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
10.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
06.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
07.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[E]WO9521189  (IMPERIAL COLLEGE ;KARAYIANNIS PETER (GB); THOMAS HOWARD CHRISTOPHE) [E] 1-19 * the whole document *
International search[A]  - GASTROENTEROLOGY, Volume 102, issued 1992, CARMAN et al., "Genetic Variation in Hepatitis B Virus", pages 711-719.
 [XP]  - JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, Volume 68, No. 4, issued April 1994, YAMAMOTO et al., "Naturally Occurring Escape Mutants of Hepatitis B Virus with Various Mutations in the S Gene in Carriers Seropositive for Antibody to Hepatitis B Surface Antigen", pages 2671-2676.