Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0697867

EP0697867 - COMPOSITIONS IN THE FORM OF SOLID SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2001/49]
Former [1996/09]For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / GRABOWSKI, Sven
Pfalzgrafenstrasse 53
D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
02 / MUELLER, Winfried
Meerwiesenstrasse 33
D-68163 Mannheim / DE
03 / ROSENBERG, Joerg
Bruchstrasse 29
D-67158 Ellerstadt / DE
04 / BINDER, Rudolf
Ostpreussenstrasse 18
D-67551 Worms / DE
05 / SANNER, Axel
Lorscher Ring 2c
D-67227 Frankenthal / DE
[1996/09]
Representative(s)Thalhammer, Wolfgang , et al
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner (GbR)
Patentanwälte
Postfach 21 11 60
67011 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/10]Thalhammer, Wolfgang , et al
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner (GbR) Patentanwälte Postfach 21 11 60
D-67011 Ludwigshafen / DE
Application number, filing date94917601.009.05.1994
[1996/09]
WO1994EP01489
Priority number, dateDE1993431653718.05.1993         Original published format: DE 4316537
[1996/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9426267
Date:24.11.1994
[1994/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0697867
Date:28.02.1996
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.1994
[1996/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0697867
Date:05.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.11.1994
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/37, A61K31/425, A61K47/30
[1996/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/09]
TitleGerman:ZUBEREITUNGEN IN FORM FESTER LÖSUNGEN[1996/09]
English:COMPOSITIONS IN THE FORM OF SOLID SOLUTIONS[1996/09]
French:COMPOSITIONS SOUS FORME DE SOLUTIONS SOLIDES[1996/09]
Entry into regional phase16.09.1995National basic fee paid 
16.09.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.09.1995Examination requested  [1996/09]
05.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.2001Fee for grant paid
07.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
17.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
17.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR05.12.2001
PT05.03.2002
LU09.05.2002
[2004/39]
Former [2002/49]GR05.12.2001
PT05.03.2002
Former [2002/48]PT05.03.2002
Cited inInternational search[DX]US5073563  (FRICKEL FRITZ-FRIEDER [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,6,7 * column 5, line 40 - line 55; example 107 *;
 [DY]DE3830355  (BASF AG [DE]) [DY] 1-7 * page 2, line 38 - line 68 * * page 3, line 40 - page 4, line 19 *;
 [YD]EP0111746  (BASF AG [DE]) [YD] 1-7 * page 10, line 1 - line 12 *