Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0702746

EP0702746 - SYSTEM FOR IN SITU REPLACEMENT OF CUTTING MEANS FOR A GROUND DRILL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2000
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Down Hole Technologies Pty. Ltd.
Unit 5, 9 Hayden Court
Myaree, W.A. 6154 / AU
[1996/13]
Inventor(s)01 / MCLEOD, Gavin, Thomas
21B Hertford Close
Bullcreek, W.A. 6154 / AU
02 / EGAN, Matthew, Vance
21 San Miguel Drive
Leeming, W.A. 6155 / AU
[1996/13]
Representative(s)Brunner, Michael John , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/13]Brunner, Michael John , et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date94918244.815.06.1994
[1996/13]
WO1994AU00322
Priority number, dateAU1993PL0940716.06.1993         Original published format: AU PL940793
AU1994PL0415802.03.1994         Original published format: AU PL415894
AU1994PL0415902.03.1994         Original published format: AU PL415994
[1996/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9429567
Date:22.12.1994
Language:EN
[1994/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0702746
Date:27.03.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.1994
[1996/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0702746
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU22.12.1994
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:E21B23/03, E21B10/66, E21B10/02, E21B25/02, E21B23/02
[1996/36]
Former International [1996/13]E21B23/03, E21B10/66
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/13]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUM IM LOCH AUSWECHSELN VON SCHNEIDMITTELN FÜR EINEN BOHRMEISSEL[1996/13]
English:SYSTEM FOR IN SITU REPLACEMENT OF CUTTING MEANS FOR A GROUND DRILL[1996/13]
French:SYSTEME DE REMPLACEMENT IN SITU DE MOYENS COUPANTS POUR UN TREPAN DE SONDAGE[1996/13]
MiscellaneousEPB 2000/08: (deleted)
EPB 2000/08: (deleted)
EPB 2000/08: (deleted)
EPB 1996/13: Teilanmeldung 95108813.7 eingereicht am 15/06/94
EPB 1996/13: Divisional application 95108813.7 filed on 15/06/94
EPB 1996/13: Demande divisionnaire 95108813.7 déposée le 15/06/94
Entry into regional phase09.06.1995National basic fee paid 
09.06.1995Search fee paid 
09.06.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.12.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
09.06.1995Examination requested  [1996/13]
14.02.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.1999Fee for grant paid
10.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP95108813.7  / EP0678651
EP95108814.5  / EP0678652
EP95108815.2  / EP0678653
EP95108816.0  / EP0678654
Opposition(s)24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
FR23.02.2000
GR23.02.2000
IT23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
NL23.02.2000
DK23.05.2000
PT23.05.2000
DE24.05.2000
IE15.06.2000
LU15.06.2000
MC30.06.2000
ES17.08.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2006/14]AT23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
FR23.02.2000
GR23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
NL23.02.2000
DK23.05.2000
PT23.05.2000
DE24.05.2000
IE15.06.2000
LU15.06.2000
MC30.06.2000
ES17.08.2000
Former [2005/23]AT23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
GR23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
NL23.02.2000
DK23.05.2000
PT23.05.2000
DE24.05.2000
IE15.06.2000
LU15.06.2000
MC30.06.2000
FR21.07.2000
ES17.08.2000
Former [2004/07]AT23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
GR23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
NL23.02.2000
DK23.05.2000
PT23.05.2000
DE24.05.2000
IE15.06.2000
MC30.06.2000
FR21.07.2000
ES17.08.2000
Former [2004/04]AT23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
NL23.02.2000
DK23.05.2000
PT23.05.2000
DE24.05.2000
IE15.06.2000
MC30.06.2000
FR21.07.2000
ES17.08.2000
Former [2003/45]AT23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
NL23.02.2000
DK23.05.2000
PT23.05.2000
DE24.05.2000
IE15.06.2000
MC30.06.2000
FR21.07.2000
Former [2003/08]AT23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
NL23.02.2000
PT23.05.2000
DE24.05.2000
IE15.06.2000
MC30.06.2000
FR21.07.2000
Former [2002/42]AT23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
PT23.05.2000
DE24.05.2000
IE15.06.2000
MC30.06.2000
FR21.07.2000
Former [2002/11]AT23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
PT23.05.2000
DE24.05.2000
IE15.06.2000
FR21.07.2000
Former [2001/50]AT23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
PT23.05.2000
IE15.06.2000
FR21.07.2000
Former [2001/16]AT23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
PT23.05.2000
FR21.07.2000
Former [2001/09]AT23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
PT23.05.2000
Former [2001/08]AT23.02.2000
CH23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
Former [2000/52]CH23.02.2000
LI23.02.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0208532  (DIAMANT BOART LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2 * column A; figure - *;
 [X]EP0429649  (VNII METODIKI I TEKHN RAZVEDKI [SU]) [X] 1,2 * column A; figure - *;
 [X]US2982366  (CAMP JOHN M, et al) [X] 1,2 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]US4497382  (NENKOV NIKOLAY D [BG]) [A] 25 * column A; figure - *
International search[A]US4828023  (LEGGETT HENRY H [SG]);
 [A]US2640546  (BAKER REUBEN C);
 [A]US2358466  (MILLER IRA A);
 [A]GB788637  (BAKER OIL TOOLS INC)