blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0706740 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0706740



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 974
29.10.2005 Drawings Opposition 23
29.10.2005 Matter concerning the application Opposition 2
25.10.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.10.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
25.10.2005 Drawings Opposition 23
25.10.2005 Matter concerning the application Opposition 2
17.10.2005 Request for change of address Opposition 1
13.10.2005 Request for change of address Opposition 1
23.09.2005 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
21.09.2005 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
21.09.2005 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
30.08.2005 Claims Opposition 6
30.08.2005 Claims Opposition 7
30.08.2005 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
01.06.2005 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
01.06.2005 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
18.05.2005 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
12.02.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
04.02.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 21
04.02.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 33
04.02.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
04.02.2005 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
04.02.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 6
04.02.2005 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
04.02.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.02.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
04.02.2005 Means of redress Opposition 1
04.02.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
04.02.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
04.02.2005 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
10.12.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
24.11.2004 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
18.08.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.08.2004 Annex to a communication Opposition 42
12.08.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
12.08.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
04.08.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.07.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.07.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.08.2002 Claims Opposition 5
12.08.2002 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 7
06.08.2002 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.06.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
26.06.2002 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.06.2002 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.04.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
17.04.2002 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
10.04.2002 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
25.01.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.01.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.01.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
17.01.2002 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
09.01.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.12.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
10.12.2001 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
30.11.2001 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
19.04.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.04.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
15.02.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.02.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
14.02.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
08.02.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
18.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.12.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.12.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
09.08.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
09.08.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.07.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
29.06.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 17
29.06.2000 General authorisation Opposition 2
29.06.2000 General authorisation Opposition 2
29.06.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
29.06.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
29.06.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
29.06.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 18
28.06.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
28.06.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
28.06.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 35
19.08.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
29.06.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.06.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
29.06.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
06.04.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
26.03.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.03.1999 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
01.03.1999 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
26.02.1999 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
19.10.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
19.10.1998 Text intended for grant Search / examination 72
02.10.1998 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
03.08.1998 Claims Search / examination 6
03.08.1998 Description Search / examination 42
03.08.1998 Drawings Search / examination 23
03.08.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.06.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.06.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.06.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.03.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.03.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.12.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
03.01.1996 Claims Search / examination 17
03.01.1996 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.01.1996 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
21.12.1995 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.12.1995 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.12.1995 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.12.1995 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.12.1995 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.12.1995 General enquiry Search / examination 1
14.12.1995 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
14.12.1995 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
14.12.1995 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 17
08.08.1995 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 19
08.08.1995 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
08.08.1995 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.01.1995 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
27.01.1995 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 2
27.01.1995 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
05.01.1995 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
21.12.1994 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
24.11.1994 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 184
24.11.1994 Priority document Search / examination 144