blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0660204 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0660204



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 488
13.02.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.03.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
24.01.2000 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.01.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
24.01.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
17.01.2000 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
17.01.2000 Translation of priority document Search / examination 37
17.01.2000 Translation of priority document Search / examination 37
14.01.2000 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 11
18.10.1999 Filing of a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
18.10.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
08.10.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.10.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
01.06.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
01.06.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 102
07.05.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
18.01.1999 Claims Search / examination 5
18.01.1999 Description Search / examination 2
18.01.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.01.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
02.09.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
02.06.1998 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.04.1998 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
27.03.1998 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
18.03.1998 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.03.1998 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 7
15.09.1995 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
15.09.1995 Description Search / examination 10
06.06.1995 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
06.06.1995 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
17.05.1995 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
11.05.1995 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
20.03.1995 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
14.02.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.02.1995 Claims Search / examination 5
14.02.1995 Description Search / examination 41
14.02.1995 Drawings Search / examination 22
14.02.1995 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
14.02.1995 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
19.01.1995 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
19.01.1995 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 96
19.01.1995 Priority document Search / examination 24
19.01.1995 Priority document Search / examination 24