blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0660204


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  28.03.2001 [2001/13]
25.02.2000 (Expected) grant published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
28.01.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant
13.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.07.1999 Renewal fee
27.05.1999 Communication of intention to grant
25.01.1999 Examination report or reply
28.08.1998 First examination report
27.08.1998 Examination report or reply
17.07.1998 Renewal fee
20.03.1998 Supplementary search report published on  06.05.1998 [1998/19]
25.07.1997 Renewal fee
19.07.1996 Renewal fee
14.07.1995 Request for examination filed published on  30.08.1995 [1995/35]
12.05.1995 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.06.1995 [1995/26]