blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0660204
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3041955BGlobal Dossier 15.05.2000B2
Priority number Date
JP50395195 04.07.1994
JP16574593 05.07.1993
JP9401087 04.07.1994
JP19751193 09.08.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3094935BGlobal Dossier 03.10.2000B2
JPH114706 12.01.1999A
Priority number Date
JP6364997 17.03.1997
JP16574593 05.07.1993
JP19751193 09.08.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0660204Global Dossier 12.04.2000B1
EP0660204 06.05.1998A4
EP0660204 28.06.1995A1
Priority number Date
JP16574593 05.07.1993
JP9401087 04.07.1994
JP19751193 09.08.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69423951D 18.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
JP16574593 05.07.1993
JP9401087 04.07.1994
JP19751193 09.08.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69423951T 19.10.2000T2
Priority number Date
JP16574593 05.07.1993
JP9401087 04.07.1994
JP19751193 09.08.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1016024 01.12.2000A1
Priority number Date
JP16574593 05.07.1993
JP9401087 04.07.1994
JP19751193 09.08.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR960701392 24.02.1996A
Priority number Date
JP16574593 05.07.1993
JP9401087 04.07.1994
JP19751193 09.08.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5615179 25.03.1997A
Priority number Date
JP16574593 05.07.1993
JP9401087 04.07.1994
JP19751193 09.08.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9502210Global Dossier 19.01.1995A1
Priority number Date
JP16574593 05.07.1993
JP19751193 09.08.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1050205C 08.03.2000C
CN1111920 15.11.1995A
Priority number Date
JP16574593 05.07.1993
JP19751193 09.08.1993