blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0660204

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
Examination procedure14.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase14.02.1995Translation filed 
09.02.1995National basic fee paid 
09.02.1995Search fee paid 
09.02.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.1995Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
13.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted12.04.2000
Opposition procedure13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit published on 28.03.2001 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:28.06.1995 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:30.08.1995 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19950706
 
Event date:06.05.1998 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A4
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:06.05.1998 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19980318
 
Event date:14.10.1998 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19980902
 
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:18.05.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69423951
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000518
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:13.07.2000 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:28.03.2001 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:31.10.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20080711
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:28.11.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20080718
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.12.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20080709
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:24.03.2010 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20090704
 
Event date:23.04.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20100331
 
Event date:30.04.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090731
 
Event date:31.05.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090704
 
Event date:30.06.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20100202