Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0660204

EP0660204 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE HAVING WEARING BAND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
Former [1995/26]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAMOTO, Akio
Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi
Nagano-ken 392 / JP
02 / IWANAMI, Wataru
Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi
Nagano-ken 392 / JP
03 / YABE, Hiroshi
Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi
Nagano-ken 392 / JP
04 / YAMAZAKI, Kenji
Seiko Epsom Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi
Nagano-ken 392 / JP
05 / MIYASHITA, Tatsumi
Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi
Nagano-ken 392 / JP
06 / TSURUBUCHI, Akeshi
Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi
Nagano-ken 392 / JP
[1995/26]
Representative(s)Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon
9 John Street
London
WC1N 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/26]Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row Holborn
London WC1R 4JH / GB
Application number, filing date94919849.304.07.1994
[1995/26]
WO1994JP01087
Priority number, dateJP1993016574505.07.1993         Original published format: JP 16574593
JP1993019751109.08.1993         Original published format: JP 19751193
[1995/26]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9502210
Date:19.01.1995
Language:EN
[1995/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0660204
Date:28.06.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.1995
[1995/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0660204
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP19.01.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.1998
ClassificationInternational:G04G1/00
[1995/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/26]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT MIT ARMBAND[1995/26]
English:ELECTRONIC DEVICE HAVING WEARING BAND[1995/26]
French:DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE A BRACELET[1995/26]
Entry into regional phase14.02.1995Translation filed 
09.02.1995National basic fee paid 
09.02.1995Search fee paid 
09.02.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.1995Examination requested  [1995/35]
02.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2000Fee for grant paid
14.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
13.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB880121  (DUROWE A.G.) [Y] 1-5 * page 4, lines 5-30; figures 3-10 *;
 [Y]JPS524270  ;
 [A]DE2543157  (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [A] 1 * figures 1-8 *;
 [A]FR2641092  (CAMPS ROBERT ;PERDRIZAT LOUIS (FR); MOUDIR SAID (FR)) [A] 1
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19770620), vol. 1, no. 63, Database accession no. (E - 325), & JP52004270 A 19770113 (CITIZEN WATCH K.K.) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH02257722  ;
 [Y]JPS62184494U  ;
 [Y]JPS51161161U  ;
 [Y]JPS56151381  ;
 [A]JPS5786492U  ;
 [A]JPS56114493U  ;
 [A]JPH0181593U