Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0700402

EP0700402 - METHODS AND MATERIALS FOR MODULATION OF THE IMMUNOSUPPRESSIVE ACTIVITY AND TOXICITY OF MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tolerance therapeutics, Inc.
5421 S.Kenwood Avenue, Chicago
Illinois, 60615 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/23]For all designated states
Tolerance therapeutics, Inc.
5421 S.Kenwood Avenue
Chicago, Illinois, 60615 / US
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Bluestone, Jeffrey A.
5421 S. Kenwood Avenue
Chicago IL 60615 / US
Former [1996/11]For all designated states
ARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION
1101 East 58th Street, The University of Chicago
Chicago, Illinois 60637 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BLUESTONE, Jeffrey, A.
5421 S. Kenwood Avenue
Chicago, IL 60615 / US
02 / ZIVIN, Robert, A.
6 Glenbrook Court
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US
03 / JOLLIFFE, Linda
301 Tall Oak Lane
Somerville, NJ 08876 / US
[1996/11]
Representative(s)Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [1998/43]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Former [1998/40]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT, 52 Bounds Green Road
London N11 2EY / GB
Former [1996/11]Dost, Wolfgang, Dr. rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Bardehle, Pagenberg & Partner, Galileiplatz 1
D-81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date94920062.001.06.1994
[1996/11]
WO1994US06198
Priority number, dateUS1993007011601.06.1993         Original published format: US 70116
[1996/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9428027
Date:08.12.1994
Language:EN
[1994/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0700402
Date:13.03.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.1994
[1996/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0700402
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.12.1994
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, C07K16/46, C07K16/28
[2002/48]
Former International [1996/11]C07K15/28, A61K39/395
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1996/11]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Stoffe zur Modulation der immunsuppressiven Aktivität und Toxitätvon monoklonalen Antikörpern[1996/11]
English:METHODS AND MATERIALS FOR MODULATION OF THE IMMUNOSUPPRESSIVE ACTIVITY AND TOXICITY OF MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES[1996/11]
French:PROCEDES ET MATIERES DE MODULATION DE L'ACTIVITE IMMUNODEPRESSIVE ET DE LA TOXICITE D'ANTICORPS MONOCLONAUX[1996/11]
Entry into regional phase14.12.1995National basic fee paid 
14.12.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.12.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.12.1995Examination requested  [1996/11]
05.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
12.01.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.2002Fee for grant paid
29.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Request for further processing for:20.01.1999Request for further processing filed
20.01.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.02.1999Decision despatched
05.06.1997Request for further processing filed
05.06.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
24.06.1997Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9109968  (CELLTECH LTD [GB]) [A] 1-17 * page 13, line 34 - page 14, line 11 * * claim - *
 [DX]  - M. ALEGRE ET AL., "Effect of a single amino acid mutation on the activating and immunosuppressive properties of a", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, BALTIMORE MD, USA, (19920601), vol. 148, no. 11, pages 3461 - 3468, [DX] 1-17 * the whole document *
 [DX]  - E. WOODLE ET AL., "Humanized OKT3 antibodies: Successful transfer of immune modulating properties and idiotype expression.", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, BALTIMORE MD, USA, (19920501), vol. 148, no. 9, pages 2756 - 2763, [DX] 1-17 * abstract * * page 2761, column R, line 50 - page 2762, column L, line 13 *
 [X]  - S. BOLT ET AL., "The generation of a humanized, non-mitogenic CD3 monoclonal antibody which retains in vitro immunosuppressive properties.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, WEINHEIM, GERMANY, (199302), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 403 - 411, [X] 1-17 * abstract *
 [X]  - L. JOLLIFFE, "Humanized antibodies: Enhancing therapeutic utility through antibody engineering.", INTERNATIONAL REVIEW OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 10, no. 2-3, pages 241 - 250, [X] 1-17 * the whole document *