Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0704067

EP0704067 - PHOTOCHROMIC NAPHTHOPYRAN COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.06.2002
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PPG Industries Ohio, Inc.
3800 West 143rd Street
Cleveland, OH 44111 / US
[2001/31]
Former [1999/27]For all designated states
PPG Industries Ohio, Inc.
3800 West 143rd Street
Cleveland, OH 44111 / US
Former [1996/14]For all designated states
PPG INDUSTRIES, INC.
One PPG Place
Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15272 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KNOWLES, David, B.
1006 Blueberry Drive
Apollo, PA 15613 / US
[1996/14]
Representative(s)Fleischer, Holm Herbert , et al
polypatent
Postfach 40 02 43
51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/14]Fleischer, Holm Herbert , et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann, Dr. Hans-Günther Sternagel, Dr. Hans Dörries, Sander Aue 30
D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Application number, filing date94920739.313.06.1994
[1996/14]
WO1994US06725
Priority number, dateUS1993008025021.06.1993         Original published format: US 80250
[1996/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9500866
Date:05.01.1995
Language:EN
[1995/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0704067
Date:03.04.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.1995
[1996/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0704067
Date:01.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.01.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:G02B5/23, G02B27/00, C07D405/10, C07D407/10, C07D311/92, C07D407/04, C07D405/04
[1996/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [1996/14]
TitleGerman:PHOTOCHROME NAPHTHOPYRANVERBINDUNGEN[1996/14]
English:PHOTOCHROMIC NAPHTHOPYRAN COMPOUNDS[1996/14]
French:COMPOSES PHOTOCHROMES DU NAPHTOPYRANNE[1996/14]
Entry into regional phase09.12.1995National basic fee paid 
09.12.1995Search fee paid 
09.12.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.12.1995Examination requested  [1996/14]
02.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2001Fee for grant paid
07.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.05.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
21.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
23.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT01.08.2001
ES28.02.2002
[2008/05]
Former [2004/04]ES28.02.2002
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]US5200116  ;
 [A]US5066818