Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0706502

EP0706502 - METAL FIBER CONCRETE COMPOSITION FOR CASTING A CONCRETE ELEMENT, ELEMENTS OBTAINED AND METHOD OF THERMAL CURING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BOUYGUES TRAVAUX PUBLICS
1 avenue Eugène Freyssinet
78280 Guyancourt / FR
For all designated states
LAFARGE
61-63, rue des Belles Feuilles
75116 Paris / FR
[2000/18]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
BOUYGUES TRAVAUX PUBLICS
1 avenue Eugène Freyssinet
78280 Guyancourt / FR
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
BOUYGUES
1, Avenue Eugène Freyssinet
78190 Saint-Quentin en Yvelines / FR
Former [1996/16]For all designated states
BOUYGUES
1, Avenue Eugène Freyssinet
F-78190 Saint-Quentin en Yvelines / FR
Inventor(s)01 / RICHARD, Pierre, Emile, Félix
45, rue Chézy
F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
02 / CHEYREZY, Marcel, Hubert
125, Grande-Rue
F-92310 Sèvres / FR
03 / ROUX, Nicolas, Pierre, Jean
4, rue Romain-Gary
F-78180 Montigny-le-Bretonneux / FR
[1996/16]
Representative(s)Schrimpf, Robert
Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1996/16]Schrimpf, Robert
Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber
F-75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date94921002.530.06.1994
[1996/16]
WO1994FR00800
Priority number, dateFR1993000806301.07.1993         Original published format: FR 9308063
FR1994000280110.03.1994         Original published format: FR 9402801
[1996/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9501316
Date:12.01.1995
Language:FR
[1995/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0706502
Date:17.04.1996
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.1995
[1996/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0706502
Date:05.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.01.1995
ClassificationInternational:C04B28/02, C04B20/00, C04B41/60, C04B14/48, // (C04B28/02, 14:06, 14:48, 18:08, 18:14, 20:00)
[1996/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/16]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR MIT METALLISCHEN FASERN VERSTÄRKTES BETONELEMENT, SO ERHALTENES ELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR WÄRMEHÄRTUNG DAVON[1996/16]
English:METAL FIBER CONCRETE COMPOSITION FOR CASTING A CONCRETE ELEMENT, ELEMENTS OBTAINED AND METHOD OF THERMAL CURING[1996/16]
French:COMPOSITION DE BETON DE FIBRES METALLIQUES POUR MOULER UN ELEMENT EN BETON, ELEMENTS OBTENUS ET PROCEDE DE CURE THERMIQUE[1996/16]
Entry into regional phase15.01.1996National basic fee paid 
15.01.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.01.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/16]
20.05.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.11.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.1999Fee for grant paid
04.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XY]FR2640962  (SOGEA [FR]) [X] 1,2,6,7,10,11,16-19,25-30,33 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 33 * * page 4, line 1 - line 30 * [Y] 3-5,8,9,14,15,20,23,34,35,37;
 [Y]WO8707597  (AALBORG PORTLAND CEMENT [DK]) [Y] 3-5,8,9,14,15,20,23,34,35,37 * page 35, line 25 - page 36, line 32 * * page 51, line 10 - page 52, line 24 * * page 54, line 13 - line 35 * * page 64, line 27 - line 37 * * page 66, line 18 - page 67, line 20 * * page 75, line 13 - page 78, line 25 * * page 93, line 9 - line 19; figure 16; claims 1,9; table 2.5 *;
 [XA]EP0273181  (CEMCOM CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,6-13,16-21,25,26,28 * abstract * * page 5, line 23 - line 31 * * page 6, line 45 - page 7, line 31 * [A] 25;
 [A]DE2952783  (HISTEEL S A [CH]) [A] 1,17,26,34,35,37 * page 7, line 1 - line 23; claims 1-6 *;
 [A]US3646748  (LANG FREDERIC A) [A] 1,36,38 * column A; claims 1,3,5,6 * * column 1, line 1 - line 75 * * column 2, line 64 - line 75; example 1 *;
 [A]DE3739997  (HOCHTIEF AG HOCH TIEFBAUTEN [DE]) [A] 1-3,13,19,28 * abstract * * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 51 * * column 3, line 7 - line 45 *;
 JPS59102849  [ ] (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK);
 JPS5851904  [ ] (KURITA WATER IND LTD)
 [A]  - "Cement articles having ultra-high strenght", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19841112), vol. 101, no. 20, Database accession no. 176453t, [A] 1,2,4-9,18-22,26,28 * abstract *
 [A]  - "Roofing", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19840430), vol. 100, no. 18, Database accession no. 144069k, [A] 1,2,4,5,17-22,24,28 * abstract *