EP0712488 - Test gas detection with quarz glass film, heater, and gas extracting vacuum meter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/21] | TEST GAS DETECTOR, PREFERABLY FOR LEAK DETECTORS, AND PROCESS FOR OPERATING A TEST GAS DETECTOR OF THIS KIND | ||
[1999/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.2001 [2001/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEYBOLD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Bonner Strasse 498 50968 Köln / DE | [2000/40] |
Former [1996/21] | For all designated states LEYBOLD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Bonner Strasse 498 D-50968 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖHM, Thomas Elsenborner Strasse 24 D-50933 Köln / DE | 02 /
DÖBLER, Ulrich Dortenhof 4a D-42929 Wermelskirchen / DE | [1996/21] | Representative(s) | Leineweber, Jürgen Patentanwalt Siebachstrasse 47 50733 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/21] | Leineweber, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. Aggerstrasse 24 50859 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 94921645.1 | 14.07.1994 | [1996/21] | WO1994EP02311 | Priority number, date | DE19934326265 | 05.08.1993 Original published format: DE 4326265 | [1996/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9504921 | Date: | 16.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0712488 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0712488 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/20, G01M3/22 | [1996/21] | CPC: |
G01M3/202 (EP,US);
G01M3/20 (KR);
G01M3/207 (EP,US);
G01M3/226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/21] | Title | German: | Testgasdetektion mit Quarzglasschicht, Heizung und gasaufzehrendem Vakuummeter | [1999/33] | English: | Test gas detection with quarz glass film, heater, and gas extracting vacuum meter | [1999/33] | French: | Détection de gaz témoin avec un film en verre quartz, chauffage et jauge à vide d'extraction du gaz | [1999/33] |
Former [1996/21] | TESTGASDETEKTOR, VORZUGSWEISE FÜR LECKSUCHGERÄTE, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES TESTGASDETEKTORS DIESER ART | ||
Former [1996/21] | TEST GAS DETECTOR, PREFERABLY FOR LEAK DETECTORS, AND PROCESS FOR OPERATING A TEST GAS DETECTOR OF THIS KIND | ||
Former [1996/21] | DETECTEUR DE GAZ TEMOIN, DE PREFERENCE POUR APPAREILS DE DETECTION DE FUITES, ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN DETECTEUR DE GAZ TEMOIN DE CE TYPE | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/21] | 14.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/38] | Request for further processing for: | 21.01.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 21.01.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.02.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR1181312 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE) [X] 1,2,4,6 * the whole document * [Y] 7,9-13; | [Y]US3591827 (HALL LEWIS D) [Y] 9,10 * abstract *; | [Y]WO8804774 (MARTIN MARIETTA CORP [US]) [Y] 9,10* abstract *; | [DY]EP0352371 (VARIAN SPA [IT]) [DY] 7,12,13 * the whole document * | [Y] - R.LARSON, "Gegenwaertiger Stand der Entwicklung bei Heliummassenspektrometer-Lecksuchern.", TECHNISCHES MESSEN, MUENCHEN,DE, (198205), vol. 49, no. 5, pages 193 - 199 [Y] 11 |