Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0669065

EP0669065 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONVEYING INFORMATION IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.05.2002
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.06.2002  [2002/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOTOROLA, INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
[1995/35]
Inventor(s)01 / KOTZIN, Michael, D.
321 Fox Hill Drive
Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US
02 / BRUCKERT, Eugene, J.
203 W. Noyes
Arlington Heights, IL 60005 / US
[1995/35]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Motorola
European Intellectual Property Operations
Midpoint
Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/35]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Motorola, European Intellectual Property, Midpoint, Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Application number, filing date94921978.621.06.1994
[1995/35]
WO1994US06954
Priority number, dateUS1993009114713.07.1993         Original published format: US 91147
[1995/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9502934
Date:26.01.1995
Language:EN
[1995/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0669065
Date:30.08.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.1995
[1995/35]
Search report(s)International search reportUS26.01.1995
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP05.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/00, H04Q7/30
[2000/08]
Former International [1995/35]H04L9/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1995/35]
TitleGerman:EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON INFORMATIONEN IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK[1995/35]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONVEYING INFORMATION IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK[1995/35]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE D'ACHEMINEMENT D'INFORMATIONS DANS UN RESEAU DE TRANSMISSION[1995/35]
Entry into regional phase27.06.1995National basic fee paid 
27.06.1995Search fee paid 
27.06.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
26.07.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.07.1995Examination requested  [1995/38]
10.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/26]
28.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.05.1995DE   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.1995
17.05.1995FR   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.1995
17.05.1995GB   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.1995
17.05.1995SE   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.1995
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9306663  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 1, line 5 - line 9 * * page 3, line 5 - line 22 * * page 4, line 32 - page 6, line 6 * * page 8, line 19 - page 12, line 25 * * figures 2,4 *;
 [X]EP0444485  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-5,7 * column 4, line 11 - column 6, line 10 *;
 [X]EP0522774  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 10 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 11 * * column 19, line 4 - column 21, line 27 * * column 26, line 41 - column 36, line 29 * * figures 6,16,17,19,20 *
 [X]  SALEH M A ET AL, "SIMULATION ANALYSIS OF A COMMUNICATION LINK WITH STATISTICALLY MULTIPLEXED BURSTY VOICE SOURCES", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19930401), vol. 11, no. 3, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 432 - 442, XP000377965 [X] 8,9 * page 433, column R, line 1 - page 434, column L, line 17 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.219556
 [X]  BERRUTO E ET AL, "VARIABLE-RATE FOR THE BASIC SPEECH SERVICE IN UMTS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (1993), vol. CONF. 43, ISBN 0-7803-1267-8, pages 520 - 523, XP000393235 [X] 8,9 * page 521, column L, line 23 - page 522, column L, line 26 *
International search[AP]US5274667  (OLMSTEAD DAVID [US])