Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0715697

EP0715697 - TRANSMISSION MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aimbridge Pty. Ltd.
9th Floor, 161 Collins Street
Melbourne, VIC 3000 / AU
[1996/24]
Inventor(s)01 / WILLMOT, Eric, Paul
19 Grevillea Crescent
Stonyfell, S.A. 5066 / AU
[1996/24]
Representative(s)Howden, Christopher A.
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/24]Howden, Christopher Andrew
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date94922194.905.08.1994
[1996/24]
WO1994AU00445
Priority number, dateAU1993PM0091230.08.1993         Original published format: AU PM091293
[1996/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9506829
Date:09.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0715697
Date:12.06.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.1995
[1996/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0715697
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU09.03.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:F16H29/16, F16H29/18, F16H29/20, F16H48/16
[1996/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/24]
TitleGerman:GETRIEBEMECHANISMUS[1996/24]
English:TRANSMISSION MECHANISM[1996/24]
French:MECANISME DE TRANSMISSION[1996/24]
Entry into regional phase08.02.1996National basic fee paid 
08.02.1996Search fee paid 
08.02.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
08.02.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.03.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
08.02.1996Examination requested  [1996/24]
26.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.12.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2000Fee for grant paid
11.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
08.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
10.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
CH23.05.2001
GR23.05.2001
IT23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
NL23.05.2001
IE06.08.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
ES30.11.2001
[2008/05]
Former [2004/07]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
CH23.05.2001
GR23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
NL23.05.2001
IE06.08.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
ES30.11.2001
Former [2004/04]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
CH23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
NL23.05.2001
IE06.08.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
ES30.11.2001
Former [2003/45]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
CH23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
NL23.05.2001
IE06.08.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2003/08]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
CH23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
NL23.05.2001
IE06.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/48]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
CH23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
IE06.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/26]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
CH23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/15]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
CH23.05.2001
LI23.05.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/14]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/12]BE23.05.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/05]SE23.08.2001
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4712450  (TAKAMIYA KIKUZO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,9,10,15-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 25 * * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 64 * * figures 1-9,15 * [A] 7,11,12;
 [X]US4983151  (PIRES PAUL B [US]) [X] 1,9,12-14 * abstract * * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 22 * * column 11, line 45 - column 12, line 46 * * figures 1-9,20 *;
 [X]BE382384  (HAP MANUFACTURING LIMITED) [X] 15 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [XA]FR1078473  (CHAMBON F, CHAMBON J) [X] 15,17 * page 3, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 4, column 2, paragraph 3 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 1,3,9,10,18-20;
 [X]US4732054  (TAKAMIYA KIKUZO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,9,10,18-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 11 - line 52 * * column 5, line 28 - line 19 * * column 7, line 8 - line 40 * * figures 1-5,8,9 *;
 [A]FR1067935  (EXCENTRIC GETRIEBE G M B H) [A] 1,3,9,10,18-20 * page 1, column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 3, column 1, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US5029486  (MERCAT JEAN-PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1,9,10,18-20 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2864259  (HENRY TROEGER) [A] 1,9,12-14 * the whole document *
International search[X]US4732054  (TAKAMIYA KIKUZO [JP], et al);
 [A]AU7648381  (WILLMOT ERIC PAUL);
 [A]US5029486  (MERCAT JEAN-PIERRE [FR])